Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 1223 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 6340 Week
» 26782 Month
» 363628 Year
» 1585193 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1110 m/e 05/1904
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9369 m/e 02/1926
British Railways 49369 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 4 Cylinder Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B05/1904
G112/1921
G2A10/1946
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4398
To Service During 05/1904
Withdrawal During 04/1950
Service Life 45 yrs, 11 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1904
5B Crewe South on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn m/e 04/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 5B Crewe South 4w/e 30/03/1946
LOAN 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 24/01/1948
EXLOAN 5B Crewe South w/e 03/04/1948
ALLOC 3A Bescot w/e 24/04/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1904 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1110
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4398
   
02/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 9369    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Crewe South (5B)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 49369 but not taken up    
04/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 9369    

prev prev