Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 77 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 5194 Week
» 25636 Month
» 362482 Year
» 1584047 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1122 m/e 05/1904
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9099 m/e 03/1926
British Railways 49099 m/e 09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 4 Cylinder Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B05/1904
G05/1910
G110/1927
G2A02/1941
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4399
To Service During 05/1904
Withdrawal w/e Sat 21/07/1962
Service Life 58 yrs, 2 mths , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1904
3A Bescot on 01/01/1948
21C Bushbury w/e 24/03/1962
   Withdrawn w/e 21/07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 3A Bescot w/e 21/06/1947
ALLOC 21C Bushbury 4w/e 31/03/1962
WDN   w/e 21/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1961 Bescot MPD (21B) (Stored) Stored are 42421, 42940, 43963, 47296/363, 49021/77/99/126/275/343/411, 58119/204/283. Also possibly stored 40694 an 58122/3. SLS/196109

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1904 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1122
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4399
   
03/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 9099    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bescot (3A)    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 49099    
24/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bushbury (21C)    
21/07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 49099    

prev prev