Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 207 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 5324 Week
» 25766 Month
» 362612 Year
» 1584177 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 818 m/e 05/1904
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9132 m/e 08/1927
British Railways 49132 m/e 11/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 4 Cylinder Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B05/1904
G09/1910
G101/1924
G2A02/1940
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4401
To Service During 05/1904
Withdrawal w/e Sat 18/04/1959
Service Life 54 yrs, 11 mths , 19 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1904
9D Buxton (LNWR) on 01/01/1948
8A Edge Hill w/e 03/01/1959
   Withdrawn w/e 18/04/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill 5w/e 31/01/1959
WDN   w/e 18/04/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1904 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 818
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4401
   
08/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 9132    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Buxton (LNWR) (9D)    
11/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 49132    
03/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
18/04/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 49132    

prev prev