Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 24 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 2612 Week
» 32110 Month
» 368956 Year
» 1590521 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1585 m/e 05/1904
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9609 m/e 09/1927
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1930) 8895 m/e 07/1930
British Railways 48895 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 4 Cylinder Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B05/1904
E10/1906
G104/1923
G2A04/1944
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4402
To Service During 05/1904
Withdrawal w/e Sat 05/12/1964
Scrapping Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 60 yrs, 7 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1904
4A Shrewsbury on 01/01/1948
10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 2w/e 17/06/1950
21C Bushbury w/e 18/08/1962
2F Bescot w/e 03/10/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 05/12/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 4A Shrewsbury w/e 08/03/1947
ALLOC 23B Aintree w/e 07/08/1948
ALLOC 5B Crewe South w/e 23/10/1948
ALLOC 3A Bescot w/e 28/05/1949
ALLOC 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 27/05/1950
ALLOC 21C Bushbury 4w/e 01/09/1962
ALLOC 2F Bescot 3w/e 03/10/1964
WDN   w/e 05/12/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
05/03/1961 Crewe Works (Outside Erecting Shops) Paint Shop: D90/5, 41247/50/5/7/9/64/82, 45228, 45658, 48686, 48733, L.N.W.R. 1054, and the usual preserved engines. Outside Paint Shop: D86/9/91-3, 44768, 48470. 48693, 49395, 84012. Works Sidings: 42584, 42678, 44665, 44868, 45101/90/8, 45205/64, 45391, 45500/4, 45612, 46101/64, 47271, 47672, 48101/22, 48437, 48628/57, 48734, 49149/73, 49335, 78030/4/64, 90313/43, 92009, 92159. Erecting Shops: D94/100-7, 41203/26, 42086, 42557/67, 42657/86, 44664/91, 44738/73, 44802/22/40, 44917, 45062/95, 45106/13/6/48/85, 45217/38/41/57, 45302/14/39/72/92, 45425/46, 45514, 45629/45/98, 45702/8, 46139/44, 46231, 47008, 48345, 48502, 48659, 49122, 49431, 70042, 71000, 90064, 90110, 90207/92, 90399, 90544/79/84, 92046/69. Outside Erecting Shops: 45000/15, 45533, 46421, 48895, 49328, 49448, 92135. New Erecting Shop: D96-9/108/9. Outside New Erecting Shop: D110. Scrap Road: 40001, 42397, 42438, 43194, 43333, 43562, 49243, with 45511 just cut-up. Leaving Works: 45341, 45613, 48705, 92087. Works Shunters: 12020, 44373/4, 47592, 47618, 51412/46, 52312, 52441/64. SLS/196104
07/05/1961 Crewe Works (Works Sidings) Paint Shop: D100-2, 41254/65/73, 41325, 44872, 90173 and the usual preserved locos. Outside Paint Shop: D103/5, 44837/43, 45565, 49395, 90582. Works Sidings: 41222, 42114, 42283, 42569, 43200, 43605, 44731/64, 44906, 45150, 45226/53, 45417, 45507/84, 46130, 46227/45, 46410/43, 47513, 47625, 48262, 48435, 48603, 48895, 49431, 70050, 78021, 90033, 92107. Erecting Shop: D110-6, 41246/64, 42110/54/60/86, 42285, 42557, 42618, 44750/62, 44834/9/91, 44932, 45078, 45142/82, 45238/74, 45300/97, 45441, 45514/21/45, 45613/28/44/64/95, 45701/2/10/36, 46127/50/7/70, 46246/7, 46487, 46501, 48171, 48317/54, 48430/74, 48511, 48672, 49094, 78031/62, 90214/99, 90315, 90530, 90712, 92020/49. Outside Erecting Shop: 42584, 44937, 45014, 45681, 48418/31/44, 90555, 92124. New Erecting Shop: D106-9/17-9. Scrap Road: 40204, 40589, 43515, 43729, 43948, 44072, 44357, 44480, 47626/37, 58221, with 47190 just cut-up. Works Shunters: 12022, 43957, 44363, 44552, 47592, 51412, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441. SLS/196106
18/12/1963 Bescot MPD 49361 an 49407 went light to Crewe South on 18th December, where they are to be fitted with snow-ploughs and kept available in steam for snow-plough duties if required. As 49173 is awaiting spares, this leaves only two Super Ds for four rostered jobs and thus Class 4Fs have been used (ex-store), although 48895 is often borrowed from Bushbury. SLS/196401

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1904 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1585
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4402
   
09/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 9609    
07/1930 Renumbered Renumbered to 8895    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Shrewsbury (4A)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 48895    
17/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
18/08/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bushbury (21C)    
03/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (2F)    
05/12/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 48895    

prev prev