Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 1257 Today
» 1315 Yesterday
» 1257 Week
» 30755 Month
» 367601 Year
» 1589166 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 2056 m/e 05/1904
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9359 m/e 05/1927
British Railways 49359 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 4 Cylinder Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B05/1904
E01/1907
G105/1921
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4403
To Service During 05/1904
Withdrawal w/e Sat 02/02/1952
Service Life 47 yrs, 9 mths , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1904
2B Bletchley on 01/01/1948
3A Bescot 3w/e 11/12/1948
   Withdrawn w/e 02/02/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 10B Preston w/e 05/06/1948
ALLOC 3A Bescot w/e 27/11/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1904 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2056
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4403
   
05/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 9359    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bletchley (2B)    
11/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (3A)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 49359 but not taken up    
02/02/1952 Withdrawn Condemned as 9359    

prev prev