Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 665 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 3253 Week
» 32751 Month
» 369597 Year
» 1591162 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1436 m/e 08/1904
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8951 m/e 09/1927
British Railways 48951 m/e 06/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 4 Cylinder Compound
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B08/1904
G110/1923
G2A02/1939
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4410
To Service During 08/1904
Withdrawal w/e Sat 31/08/1957
Service Life 53 yrs , 1 mth

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1904
2B Bletchley on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn w/e 31/08/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 2C Northampton w/e 19/10/1946
WDN   w/e 31/08/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1952 Locomotives still carrying old numbers (LMS) Engines running with L.M.S. Numbers. (March 1952) 407, 493, 682, 1324, 1370, 2093, 2994/8, 3062, 3253, 3301/32, 3436, 3514, 3622/62, 3731/49, 3820, 4245, 4436, 6899, 7112/28/29/91, 7377/81, 7407/19/23/96, 7625, 7752, 7822, 8278, 8310, 8510, 8602, 8745, 8921/51, 9010/61, 9108/16/29/99, 9265/70/75/77, 9330/85, 9417, 10725/35, 10807/92, 11537, 12123, 12203/69/93, 16039, 22900/65, 28107/28, 28251, 28312, 28580/3/9. In works: 7597, 4003. Uncertain: 609, 2994 (? done and not advised). SLS/195206

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1904 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1436
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4410
   
09/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 8951    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bletchley (2B)    
06/1952 Renumbered Renumbered to 48951    
31/08/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 48951    

prev prev