Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 166 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17969 Week
» 70985 Month
» 190512 Year
» 3217365 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
2057 |
m/e |
08/1904 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9371 |
m/e |
02/1927 |
British Railways |
49371 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
4 Cylinder Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4412 |
To Service |
During 08/1904 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 19/01/1952 |
Service Life |
47 yrs, 5 mths , 19 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
2B |
Bletchley |
w/e |
09/11/1946 |
ALLOC |
10C |
Patricroft |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
ALLOC |
3A |
Bescot |
w/e |
25/02/1950 |
ALLOC |
3B |
Bushbury |
w/e |
15/09/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
19/01/1952 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1904 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2057 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4412 |
|
|
02/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9371 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bletchley (2B) |
|
|
05/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Patricroft (10C) |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49371 |
|
|
25/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (3A) |
|
|
15/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (3B) |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (3B) |
|
|
19/01/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49371 |
|
|