Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 233 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 5350 Week
» 25792 Month
» 362638 Year
» 1584203 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1746 m/e 07/1912
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9184 m/e 06/1928
British Railways 49184 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Cooke
Class G1
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
G107/1912
G2A01/1940
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 07/1912
Withdrawal During 01/1949
Scrapping During y/e 1949
Service Life 36 yrs, 6 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1912
5B Crewe South on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn m/e 01/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 5B Crewe South 4w/e 30/03/1946
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 15/05/1948
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction w/e 05/06/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1948 Crewe Works New Work December: 'IV° more '2F' 2-6-0's were completed dunng December-Nos. 46433 and 46434 on 8/12 and 13/12 respectively, thus completing the present order. Tne last Caprotti 4-6-0 of Order E 468, No. 44757, was completed on 22/12. No. 44728 (No. 11 of Order E 472) was completed on 31/12; the first ten of this order are to be built at Horwich. Another 'Patriot' Class 4-6-0, No. 45534, has been rebuilt with a taper boiler-completed on 10/12. No. 45522 will shortly be similarly dealt with.
Locomotives entering Works during December included: Nos. 1201, 2254, 2438/51/61/77/82, 2654/60/86/99, 2610/14/18/28/44/48/78/82, 4739/48/49, 4849/84, 4908/17/18/31/50/81, 5000/24/41/55/59/68/93, 5108/40/47, 5274/93, 4387, 5404/44/94, 5508/33/46, 5617/30/33/36/54/55/66/78, 5705, 6115/19/37/47/50/52/56, 6207/31/49/53, 6654, 6656(27A), 6727, 7757, 7803, 7987/99, 8001/63/93/98, 8143/89/97, 8200/71/80, 8373, 8409/17/39/62, 8509/20, 8606/34/51/53/59/96, 8700/03/18, 9072/85, 9122/26/64/84, 924/57/67/93, 9321/33/49, 9416/19/47, 28093, 42386, 42565, 44766, 44830, 45005/80, 46107/12/17/20/21, 47977, 49059, 49298, 58924. During w/e 8/12, No. 46121 was renamed The Highland Light Infantry (Glasgow Regiment) and fitted with a plaque.
SLS/194902

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1912 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1746
Built at Crewe Works
   
06/1928 Renumbered Renumbered to 9184    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Crewe South (5B)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 49184 but not taken up    
01/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 9184    

prev prev