Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 343 Today
» 1315 Yesterday
» 343 Week
» 29841 Month
» 366687 Year
» 1588252 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1500 m/e 04/1914
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9232 m/e 12/1927
British Railways 49232 m/e 04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Cooke
Class G1
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 04/1914
Withdrawal 2w/e Sat 17/06/1950 off Patricroft (10C)
Scrapping During y/e 1950
Service Life 36 yrs, 2 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1914
5B Crewe South on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn 2w/e 17/06/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 8D Widnes w/e 15/05/1948
ALLOC 10C Patricroft w/e 10/07/1948
WDN   w/e 17/06/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1914 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1500
Built at Crewe Works
   
12/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 9232    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Crewe South (5B)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 49232    
17/06/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 49232 from Patricroft (10C)    

prev prev