Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 236 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 5353 Week
» 25795 Month
» 362641 Year
» 1584206 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 2336 m/e 05/1914
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9241 m/e 09/1927
British Railways 49241 m/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Cooke
Class G1
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 05/1914
Withdrawal w/e Sat 20/09/1952
Scrapping During y/e 1952
Service Life 38 yrs, 4 mths , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1914
5B Crewe South on 01/01/1948
5B Crewe South 3w/e 11/12/1948
3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 27/01/1951
   Withdrawn w/e 20/09/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 11A Carnforth w/e 05/06/1948
ALLOC 5B Crewe South w/e 18/12/1948
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC 11A Carnforth w/e 08/10/1949
ALLOC 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) m/e 31/01/1951
WDN   w/e 20/09/1952

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1914 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2336
Built at Crewe Works
   
09/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 9241    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Crewe South (5B)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 49241    
11/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
27/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C)    
20/09/1952 Withdrawn Condemned as 49241    

prev prev