Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 926 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18729 Week
» 71745 Month
» 191272 Year
» 3218125 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
176 |
m/e |
07/1914 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9250 |
m/e |
06/1927 |
British Railways |
49250 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Cooke |
Class |
G1 |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
During 07/1914 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 10/04/1948 |
Service Life |
33 yrs, 9 mths , 11 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1948 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1914 |
10B |
|
Preston |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
10/04/1948 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
10/04/1948 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/04/1948 |
Crewe Works |
The first three Caprotti Class '5's' of Order E.469 Nos. 44738-40 were completed on 16/4 (44738 ), 21/4 (44739 ) and 28/4 (44740 ). They are the first of ten Caprotti engines to be equipped with plain bearings. The latest 'Royal Scot' to undergo conversion was No. 6105 which was completed on 9/4, whilst the next two 'Patriot' 4-6-0's to be rebuilt are Nos. 5532 an 5512 (in that order). It is interesting to note that these two engines are to receive new frames, hitherto, of course, all converted 'Patriot' 4-6-0's have had their original frames modified. More ex L.N.W. withdrawn locomotives have gone to the scrap heap recently. They were cut up as follows:-W/E 10/4 7946; W/E 17/4 6919, 7709, 25321; W/E 24/4 6728, 6926, 28153; W/E 1/5 9231, 9274, 25827; W/E 8/5 7821, 9250. Several ex W.D. 2-8-0 tenders recently arrived from Swindon. Four of them were fitted to ex L.M.S. 2-8-0's to replace the tenders sent to the Southern Region for use on the ex S.R. locomotives taking part in the exchange trials. Three ex S.R. boilers of the 4-4-0 'Schools' Class recently arrived here for repair, and it is understood that more are to follow. |
SLS/194806 |
31/05/1948 |
Crewe Works |
New construction for the past month produced only three Caprotti 4-6-0's: No. 44756 (No. 9 of Order E468) completed on 10/5, and No. 44741 and 44742 (Nos. 4 & 5 of Order E.469) completed on 18/5 and 28/5 respectively. Condemned engines cut-up during the past month were dealt with a follows: W/E 8/5 Nos. 7821, 9250; W/E 15/5 Nos. 7769, 9038; W/E 22/5 Nos. 6673, 6738, 9013; W/E 29/5 Nos. 6740, 6920, 25373 an 28484. A number of War Department 2-8-0's of the standard L.M.S. '8F' type have recently returned from the Middle East, and are at present stored in the old carriage works. They are Nos. 70300/01/11/14/18/32/63/94/95/98, 70401/2/3/13/38/43/46/49, 70504/18/76/77/79/82/88 an 70611. Several of these engines are fitted with steam turbo-generators mounted on the right-hand side of the firebox, but no electric lights are in evidence, although conduit piping still exists along the boilers of a few engines. Eight locomotives were recently painted in the new experimental liveries of the British Railways Six Class '7P' 4-6-2's Nos. 46224/27/30/1/2/41 were painted blue (the shade approaching that of Oxford blue), and lined in accordance gwith ex L.N.W.R. practice, whilst two Class '6P' 4-6-0's Nos. 45540 an 46139 were painted green (a shade closely resembling the standard L.N.E.R. green) and also lined in the ex L.N.W.R. style. All eight engines had their buffers, cylinder covers, motion, etc., scoured bright |
SLS/194807 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1914 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 176 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
06/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9250 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Preston (10B) |
|
|
10/04/1948 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9250 |
|
|
05/1948 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 49250 but not taken up |
|
|