Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 558 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 3146 Week
» 32644 Month
» 369490 Year
» 1591055 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 230 m/e 05/1918
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9297 m/e 07/1927
British Railways 49297 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Cooke
Class G1
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 05/1918
Withdrawal During 04/1949
Scrapping During y/e 1949
Service Life 30 yrs, 11 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1918
8C Speke Junction on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn m/e 04/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 21/06/1947
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction w/e 27/12/1947
ALLOC 10B Preston w/e 13/03/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1949 Crewe Works During the past month a further seven Class '5' 4-6-0's-Nos. 44718-24 inclusive-have been put into traffic, painted black with red, cream and grey lining but carrying neither lettering nor crests on the tender sides. No. 46202 recently returned to traffic. The engine was run in on trips from Crewe to Shrewsbury during W/E 19/3, and returned to the regular London-Liverpool working the following week. Since then, however, it is reported to have failed again at Camden, details are not known.
Dynamometer car trials were carried out with Class '4' 2-6-0 No. 43027 on the Crewe-Holyhead line during W/E 9/4; the dynamometer car used was No. 1. Locomotives entering Works during March included:-Nos. 42227/52, 2263/66, 2432/54/80, 2541/44/63, 2611/13/42/50/57/60/73, 44745, 4775, 4819/72/97, 4911/39/63, 44984, 5046/54/88, 45091, 5110/45, 45195, 45229/34, 5244, 45264, 5269/96/7/8, 45326, 5343/82/84, 5408, 5501, 45520, 5556, 45568, 5591, 45597, 5659/70, 45676/90/99, 5703/35, 6004, 46100, 6103/10/13/21, 46134, 6155/56, 46160/63, 6169, 6206/27, 46231, 6235/50/1/2/5, 7972, 47982, 7994/95, 8026/75, 8112/50/57, 8206/70, 8301/2/3/17/24/31/50/61/67, 8495, 8522, 8610/45/91, 48696, 8770, 8906/18, 9042/52/74, 9110/11/66/85, 9210/59/63/89/96/97, 9305/29/40/63/81, 9419/27/29, 28619, 58889 and 2-10-0 73788 (65F).
SLS/194905

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1918 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 230
Built at Crewe Works
   
07/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 9297    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Speke Junction (8C)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 49297 but not taken up    
04/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 9297    

prev prev