Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 1261 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 6378 Week
» 26820 Month
» 363666 Year
» 1585231 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1158 m/e 11/1918
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 9332 m/e 02/1926
British Railways 49332 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Cooke
Class G1
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 11/1918
Withdrawal w/e Sat 29/07/1950
Scrapping During y/e 1950
Service Life 31 yrs, 8 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1918
2B Bletchley on 01/01/1948
3A Bescot 5w/e 16/07/1949
   Withdrawn w/e 29/07/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 2E Warwick w/e 31/01/1948
ALLOC 2A Rugby w/e 12/06/1948
ALLOC 2F Coventry w/e 28/05/1949
WDN   w/e 29/07/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1918 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1158
Built at Crewe Works
   
02/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 9332    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bletchley (2B)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 49332    
16/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (3A)    
29/07/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 49332    

prev prev