|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Swindon Works | 18/04/1925 | 22/06/1925 | 66 days | Heavy | Tender number 2057 (Churchward 3,500g) attached. |
68677 | |
Swindon Works | 18/09/1926 | 27/09/1926 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 28/10/1926 | 02/11/1926 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 21/02/1927 | 14/04/1927 | 53 days | Heavy | Boiler number 4606 (Diagram HA) |
170041 | |
Swindon Works | 25/06/1927 | 12/07/1927 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 03/02/1928 | 1 day | Heavy | ||||
Swindon Works | 11/05/1928 | 25/05/1928 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 09/03/1929 | 13/05/1929 | 66 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2432 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 18/03/1930 | 20/05/1930 | 64 days | Heavy | Boiler number 4626 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2545 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
342352 | |
Swindon Works | 14/07/1930 | 31/07/1930 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 11/06/1931 | 23/08/1931 | 74 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2410 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
408355 | |
Swindon Works | 19/10/1932 | 16/12/1932 | 59 days | General | Boiler number 4645 (Diagram HA) |
474831 | |
Swindon Works | 08/02/1934 | 15/04/1934 | 67 days | Intermediate | 549984 | ||
Swindon Works | 11/10/1934 | 28/10/1934 | 18 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2591 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 28/05/1935 | 25/08/1935 | 90 days | General | Boiler number 4606 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2432 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
619743 | |
Swindon Works | 31/10/1935 | 30/11/1935 | 31 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 23/01/1936 | 11/02/1936 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 05/05/1936 | 11/07/1936 | 68 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 18/11/1936 | 05/12/1936 | 18 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2405 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 31/12/1936 | 24/02/1937 | 56 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2384 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
708695 | |
Swindon Works | 19/04/1937 | 10/05/1937 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 08/06/1937 | 06/07/1937 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 11/11/1937 | 24/11/1937 | 14 days | Special | Preparation for Royal Coronation train |
||
Swindon Works | 15/01/1938 | 13/03/1938 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 4627 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2632 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
774914 | |
Swindon Works | 19/05/1938 | 11/06/1938 | 24 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 19/09/1938 | 27/10/1938 | 39 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 17/04/1939 | 19/06/1939 | 64 days | Intermediate | 848847 | ||
Swindon Works | 08/10/1940 | 04/12/1940 | 58 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2636 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
930992 | |
Swindon Works | 26/05/1941 | 08/07/1941 | 44 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2856 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 11/12/1941 | 01/02/1942 | 53 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2405 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 15/05/1942 | 13/06/1942 | 30 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 18/01/1943 | 03/03/1943 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 4638 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2821 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1018313 | |
Swindon Works | 03/07/1943 | 20/08/1943 | 49 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2674 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 27/03/1944 | 10/05/1944 | 45 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2441 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 05/09/1944 | 18/10/1944 | 44 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2895 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1079784 | |
Swindon Works | 29/05/1945 | 03/07/1945 | 36 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2411 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 12/11/1945 | 03/01/1946 | 53 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2795 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 14/03/1946 | 17/04/1946 | 35 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2755 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 04/09/1946 | 08/10/1946 | 35 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2558 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 04/01/1947 | 08/02/1947 | 36 days | Intermediate | Boiler number 6611 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2639 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1137520 | |
Swindon Works | 22/08/1947 | 28/08/1947 | 7 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 29/07/1948 | 31/08/1948 | 34 days | Light Repair | Boiler number 6602 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2583 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1198742 | |
Swindon Works | 11/05/1949 | 14/06/1949 | 35 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 4606 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2736 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1230009 | |
Swindon Works | 23/01/1951 | 26/02/1951 | 35 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 6654 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2876 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1300024 | |
Swindon Works | 14/03/1952 | 1 day | Heavy General | ||||
Swindon Works | 19/11/1953 | 05/01/1954 | 48 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 6693 (Diagram HC) Tender number 4088 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
293522 | |
Swindon Works | 19/01/1955 | 16/03/1955 | 57 days | Light Casual | Tender number 2835 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 14/11/1955 | 19/12/1955 | 36 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 7625 (Diagram HC) Tender number 2725 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
397374 | |
Swindon Works | 10/11/1956 | 18/04/1957 | 160 days | Heavy Casual | Tender number 2808 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 28/03/1958 | 29/05/1958 | 63 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 7608 (Diagram HC) Tender number 4013 (Collett 4,000g) attached. Double Chimney fitted |
499654 | |
Swindon Works | 09/12/1959 | 09/02/1960 | 63 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 6637 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2592 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
592862 | |
Swindon Works | 28/10/1961 | 22/12/1961 | 56 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 7640 (Diagram HC) Tender number 2687 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
671419 |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1945 | Swindon Works | Locos entering works during November: 13, 28, 1003, 1785, 2189, 2202/39/91, 2669, 2741, 2854, 2921/34/81, 3004/44, 3183, 3366, 3435/43, 3638, 3775/98, 3802/4/13/4/7/38/57/65, 4000/16/53/74/82/95/8, 4272 4543, 4643/58, 4826, 4965/82; 5005/17/20/6, 5125/37, 5327/50/84, 5413, 5502/23, 5735/8/59/69, 5905/16/23/32/3/9/58/69, 6002/8, 6125/57, 6353/97; 6846, 6951/4, 7243, 7712/8/73/4/7/84, 8755, 9797. The advent of a K3 to Swindon works has been commented upon in the January Journal: it has a hole in its blast pipe, a bad regulator blow-through.and a hot box on one of the driving wheels. It may be recalled that B12/3 8539 was seen on the works turntable in 1944 when she was on loan to W.D. for working Ambulance Trains, but it is not known whether, on that occasion, she had entered the works or was merely using the turntable due to some defect of the one at the shed. The scale of withdrawals has been so great that the concentration yard has been overwhelmed, and some of the locos are stored in a road adjacent to the main line-2381/5, 2406, 1161, 3439, 2732/59 being noted- there on 21/12. Both latter engines had been dead at the home sheds for some time before their withdrawal. |
SLS/194602 |
31/03/1946 | Swindon Works | Locomotives entering Works during March: 111, 1010, 2026/55, 2103, 2204/12/54, 2816/39/46/9, 2924/39/48/79, 3010/5/20, 3171, 3446, 3632, 3715/93 3855, 4012/33/5/55/79/82, 4136, 4365, 4565/70 4702, 4830/67, 4917/37/58/84/5, 5004/8/49/71/90, 5153/86/93, 5310/38/84/97, 5420, 5505/31/53, 5787,-5967/99, 6000/17/25/8, 6114/21/50/1, 6365/74/86/8 6417, 6916/8/41, 7312, 7713/32, 7802/10, 9721/60/3/80/7/90/6. Nameplates have been affixed to 1000/17-9, 6916/32/38/46/67. With the completion of 1019, there is a temporary halt in the programme of construction of '1000' Class locomotives and work is under way on new 'Castle' and 'Hall' Class locomotives. | SLS/194606 |
31/08/1947 | Swindon Works | Locos. entering Works during August included: 992, 1004, 1758, 2023, 2280, 2289, 2409, 2568, 2818, 2833, 2886, 3170, 3375, 3582, 3845, 4015, 4021, 4049, 4055, 4082, 4701, 4800, 4924, 4931, 4945, 4957, 4989, 5006, 5049, 5056, 5069, 5084, 5088, 5094, 5318, 5337, 5347, 5353, 5370, 5913, 5922, 5923, 5940, 5962, 6333, 6909, 6931, an 6965. 2-8-0's which have recently been converted to oil-burning were ex Works as follows: Nos. 4809 (2845) 11/8, 4810 (2853) 13/8, 4857 (3831) 16/8 and 4811 (2847) 20/8. The construction of Lot 366 is under way and No. 6971 (coal-burning) is nearing completion. (16/9). | SLS/194710 |
30/06/1948 | Swindon Works | Locomotives entering Works during June included: Nos 1003, 1338, 1436/49, 1782, 2135, 2816/18/29/57/85/95, 2920/40, 3802, 4031/34/83, 4805, 4908/16/52/99. 5013/16/17/26/43/51/54/72/83, 5341/53/71/79, 5411, 5908/54/72/87/99, 6007/16, 6300/01/05/16, 6400, W.D. 77325, 77407, 79266. New work (June): Nos. 7010 OXF, 7012 NYA, 7013 PDN are all painted pea green and lined out in red, cream and grey, while No. 7014 is being painted G.W. green-they are all fitted with smokebox number plates. No. 6910 has been painted black and lined out in red, cream and grey -a smokebox number plate has been fitted, while No. 7007 has had the G.W. coat of arms transfer placed on each middle splasher. Works' pilots during the month were: Nos. 906, 1713, 1900, 2751 and D.E. 15105 PDN. Nos. 1196 an 1197 were noted cut-up in the concentration yard, early in the month. Locomotives painted in the new livery, apart from new construction include: Nos. 4091, 5010/21 (green) and No. 6025 (blue); it is under-stood that No. 6001 has also been painted blue. All locomotives in the new livery have smokebox number plates, the actual figures being in brass. No. 7009, although in G.W.R. livery, has a smokebox number plate, as has No. 6022. | SLS/194808 |
31/07/1948 | Swindon Works | Locomotives entering Works during July included: Nos 1367, 1446, 2165, 2229/36, 2385, 2809/84/98, 3778, 3832/40/59, 4075/82, 4519/28/73/85, 4698, 4965/77/88, 5077, 5191, 5261, 5306, 5403, 5805, 5904/15/43, 6157, 6343/78, 6439, 6637, 6702, 6818/25/33/46/55, 7006, 7218, 7318, 7727, 7812, 8764/87, 9312/17, 9706/81; New work: Nos. 7014 BRD and 7015 SDN, both are painted G.W.R. green, as is No. 7016; the construction Of Nos. 4160-79 and 7430-39 is under way. During W/E 24/7 Nos. 5023, 6009 an 6910 were ex Works after having been in for the new British Railways' crest to be placed on the tenders, while during W/E 31/7 No. 5954 was ex general repair, having been painted black and lined out in red, cream and grey together with the new crest on the tender. During W/E 14/8 Nos. 7016 Chester Castle CDF and 7430 STB were completed; No. 8393 also entered Works during this week. It is understood that the next batch of 'Castle's' (Nos. 7018-27) has been cancelled. Works' pilots lately have been and are: Nos. 906, 1758, 1900 an 2751; The following locomotives came in for cutting-up during W/E 24/7: Nos. 2680, 3002/27, 4386, 5127 an 5349 |
SLS/194809 |
31/05/1949 | Swindon Works | New Work May: Nos. 7018 Drysllwyn Castle (originally intended to have been named Cranbrook Castle) LDR (24/5), 7019 Fowey Castle BRD (27/5), *7020 Gloucester Castle (31/5); *9682 (6/5). *Not allocated. Nos. 7018-20 are painted dark green and lined. Nos. 7021 Haverfordwest Castle and 7022 were nearly complete on 2/6; while on the same day No. 1500 had the motion, wheels, boiler and cab erected, No. 1501 cylinders, etc., erected, No. 1502 frames only and Nos. 7023/24 frames and cylinders only. Locomotives entering Works during May included: Nos. p23 (Petrol), 100A1, 1017, 1419/43, 2061 (closed cab), 2212/14/61/91, 2568, 2800/03/24/76/78/90, 3010/32, 3102/64/74, 3815/24/35, 4052/58/73/82, 4224, 4377, 4516/28/39, 4676, 4805/11/55/57 (for re-conversion to coal-burning), 4903/13/33/67/91/94, 5003/09/36/43/46/60/66/93/98, 5142, 5325/62, 5406, 5503/07/43/51, 5755/75/77, 5925/34/75/82, 6000/10/11/14, 6162/63 (both fitted with deconcentrating gear), 6346/57/62/73, 6710/16/24/31, 6823/40/61/68/73, 6931/36/43, 7222, 7321, 7704/90/94, 7806/07, 8701/41, 9613, 9700/10, 70836, 90357, 1299. Condemned: Nos. 277, 2756/89 (all acting as Works pilots), 30, 280 (still retains original boiler and has round topped tanks), 3400/43, 3577 (open cab), 5117. Nos. 6105/30 have had the footsteps set further inwards. No. E1299 failed here with a hot box on 11/5, after having worked the Grimsby fish train. Nos. 2863 (ex 4805) and 2853 (ex 4810) have been re-converted to coal-burning. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 1015, 4949/86 an 5973. Nos. 1015, 5074 and 6936 have received tenders with the new crest. Lining: Commencing with No. 5069 (ex Works 12/5), all locomotives painted dark green or black and fully lined are having the cylinders lined out with two red I' vertical bands at both ends. In addition No. 5069 also had the cleating bands lined, but subsequent locomotives (including No. 7018) have not had this done. | SLS/194907 |
04/03/1962 | Swindon Works ('A' Shop) | Triangle: 1435, 3636, 4123/6, 4929, 5167, 5509/11/49, 6152/3/66, 6348, 7421, 7796, 8441, 8700/79, 9738. Works Yard: D3437, 1009/21/7, 3809/49, 4093, 4632, 4905/44, 5924, 6006, 6408, 6820, 6965/7, 7002/4/27/37, 7306, 8489/94, 8721/33/62/75, 9460, 9765. Weigh House: 5967. 'C' Shop: 8735, 9416. Dump: 1642, 2205/6/30/88, 4207, 5069, 5770, 7771/2, 8451, 8768, 9454/74, 9720. 'A' Shop: D600/2/3, D808, D1002-17, D2182-6, D3035, D3354/6/60/6/97, D3425, D4009, D6315/23/37, 8, 1013/5/9/28, 2516, 2859/73/6, 3440, 4003, 4286, 4920/50, 5026/43/56, 5990/1, 6012, 6821/7/39, 6906/13/36/50/71/3/93, 7001/3/6/13/26, 7226, 7320/37, 7918, 9400, 82040, 92222/37. | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/04/1924 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 4082, name: WINDSOR CASTLE Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Old Oak Common (PDN) Tender fitted: Churchward 3,500g Diagram HA boiler fitted |
||
18/04/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 18/04/1925. Dep: 22/06/1925. Work undertaken: Tender number 2057 (Churchward 3,500g) attached. |
||
09/1926 | Tender | Tender fitted: Churchward 3,500g number 1833 | ||
18/09/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/09/1926. Dep: 27/09/1926. | ||
28/10/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/10/1926. Dep: 02/11/1926. | ||
21/02/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 21/02/1927. Dep: 14/04/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4606 (Diagram HA) |
||
25/06/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/06/1927. Dep: 12/07/1927. | ||
03/02/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 03/02/1928. | ||
04/05/1928 | Modification | Diagram HA number 4620 boiler fitted | ||
11/05/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/05/1928. Dep: 25/05/1928. | ||
25/05/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA) | ||
09/03/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/03/1929. Dep: 13/05/1929. Work undertaken: Tender number 2432 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
13/05/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Laira (LA) | ||
18/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 18/03/1930. Dep: 20/05/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4626 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2545 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
14/07/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/07/1930. Dep: 31/07/1930. | ||
11/06/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 11/06/1931. Dep: 23/08/1931. Work undertaken: Tender number 2410 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
23/08/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN) | ||
19/10/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1932. Dep: 16/12/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4645 (Diagram HA) |
||
16/12/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stafford Road (SRD) | ||
22/02/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN) | ||
22/02/1933 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2449 | ||
22/02/1933 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2449 | ||
24/04/1933 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2410 | ||
24/04/1933 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2410 | ||
08/02/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 08/02/1934. Dep: 15/04/1934. | ||
11/10/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/10/1934. Dep: 28/10/1934. Work undertaken: Tender number 2591 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
28/05/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1935. Dep: 25/08/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4606 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2432 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
25/08/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD) | ||
31/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/10/1935. Dep: 30/11/1935. | ||
23/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/01/1936. Dep: 11/02/1936. | ||
05/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/05/1936. Dep: 11/07/1936. | ||
18/11/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/11/1936. Dep: 05/12/1936. Work undertaken: Tender number 2405 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
31/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 31/12/1936. Dep: 24/02/1937. Work undertaken: Tender number 2384 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
19/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/04/1937. Dep: 10/05/1937. | ||
08/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/06/1937. Dep: 06/07/1937. | ||
11/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Special) - Arr: 11/11/1937. Dep: 24/11/1937. Work undertaken: Preparation for Royal Coronation train |
||
15/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1938. Dep: 13/03/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4627 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2632 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
13/03/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN) | ||
19/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/05/1938. Dep: 11/06/1938. | ||
19/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/09/1938. Dep: 27/10/1938. | ||
17/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 17/04/1939. Dep: 19/06/1939. | ||
08/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 08/10/1940. Dep: 04/12/1940. Work undertaken: Tender number 2636 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
02/1941 | Allocation | |||
26/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/05/1941. Dep: 08/07/1941. Work undertaken: Tender number 2856 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
11/12/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/12/1941. Dep: 01/02/1942. Work undertaken: Tender number 2405 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
23/04/1942 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2535 | ||
15/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/05/1942. Dep: 13/06/1942. | ||
18/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1943. Dep: 03/03/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4638 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2821 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
03/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/07/1943. Dep: 20/08/1943. Work undertaken: Tender number 2674 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
27/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/03/1944. Dep: 10/05/1944. Work undertaken: Tender number 2441 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
05/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 05/09/1944. Dep: 18/10/1944. Work undertaken: Tender number 2895 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
11/04/1945 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2405 | ||
29/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/05/1945. Dep: 03/07/1945. Work undertaken: Tender number 2411 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
12/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/11/1945. Dep: 03/01/1946. Work undertaken: Tender number 2795 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
14/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/03/1946. Dep: 17/04/1946. Work undertaken: Tender number 2755 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
04/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/09/1946. Dep: 08/10/1946. Work undertaken: Tender number 2558 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
08/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Swindon (SDN) | ||
04/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 04/01/1947. Dep: 08/02/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6611 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2639 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
08/02/1947 | Allocation | |||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Gloucester Horton Road (GLO) | ||
22/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/08/1947. Dep: 28/08/1947. | ||
13/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (STJ) | ||
09/03/1948 | Allocation | |||
29/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/07/1948. Dep: 31/08/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6602 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2583 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
09/11/1948 | Tender | Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4049 | ||
02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Worcester (WOS) | ||
26/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Worcester (WOS) | ||
11/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 11/05/1949. Dep: 14/06/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4606 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2736 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
24/01/1950 | Tender | Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4043 | ||
23/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/01/1951. Dep: 26/02/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6654 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2876 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
08/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Swindon (82C) | ||
22/02/1952 | Naming | Renamed 'BRISTOL CASTLE' | ||
22/02/1952 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 7013 | ||
11/03/1952 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2400 | ||
14/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 14/03/1952. | ||
19/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 19/11/1953. Dep: 05/01/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6693 (Diagram HC) Tender number 4088 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
05/01/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
19/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/01/1955. Dep: 16/03/1955. Work undertaken: Tender number 2835 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
14/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 14/11/1955. Dep: 19/12/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7625 (Diagram HC) Tender number 2725 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
06/10/1956 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2693 | ||
10/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 10/11/1956. Dep: 18/04/1957. Work undertaken: Tender number 2808 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
28/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 28/03/1958. Dep: 29/05/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7608 (Diagram HC) Tender number 4013 (Collett 4,000g) attached. Double Chimney fitted |
||
09/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/12/1959. Dep: 09/02/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6637 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2592 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
28/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 28/10/1961. Dep: 22/12/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7640 (Diagram HC) Tender number 2687 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
22/10/1962 | To Store | To Store at Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
13/04/1964 | Reinstated | Reinstated to Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
20/06/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyseley (2A) | ||
07/09/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 7013 from Tyseley (2A) | ||
01/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |