Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 9 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 2597 Week
» 32095 Month
» 368941 Year
» 1590506 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 739 m/e 04/1923
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 7937 m/e 04/1928
British Railways 47937 m/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Beames
Class 7F
Company History LNWR/LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
38004/1923
Wheels 0-8-4T
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 5729
To Service During 04/1923
Withdrawal w/e Sat 07/10/1950
Scrapping During y/e 1950
Service Life 27 yrs, 6 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1923
4B Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn w/e 07/10/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 4B Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) w/e 12/07/1947
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill w/e 10/04/1948
WDN   w/e 07/10/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/10/1947 Abergavenny MPD Abergavenny-Merthyr Section (ex L.N.W. Ry.): New 2-6-2T Nos. 1202/4 are now working regularly on this section, while No. 1203 is shedded at Tredegar for the Sirhowy Valley line; and returns to Abergavenny Junction shed for washout on Sundays. Thus, the old Webb 0-6-2 'Coal' tanks have once more been displaced and only the 2.20 p.m. ex Abergavenny Junction (returning with the 4.43 p.m. from Merthyr) is rostered for a 'Coal' tank; actually the train has lately had ex L.N.W.R. 0-8-0's, on account of the extreme shortage of 'Coal' tanks. The latter type are used for banking G.W.R. trains northwards from Abergavenny, and despite their age may come into their own again in the winter months when, some train crews think, the new 2-6-2T will not manage the very long banks of about 1 in 40. During the week-end September 13/14 only two 0-8-4T (ex. L.N.W.R.) were on Abergavenny Junction shed. They were Nos. 7937 an 7944. It is understood that only two are allocated here; this is a considerable reduction when compared with the 1930's when eighteen* of the class were allocated to this shed (for supplying both Blaenavon and Tredegar). The class has never been permitted beyond Morlais Junc. (B. & M. Ry. Junc.) into Merthyr-at least on paper! This also applies to Class '7F' ex L.N.W.R. 0-8-0's Nos. 9395-9454. *In 1932 Nos. 7930-7946 and 7956 were allocated to W31 (Abergavenny) of which six were sub-shedded at W31T (Tredegar) and one at W31B (Blaenavon). Nos. 7947/8 were then at W33 (Swansea) and 7949-55/7-9 were at W26 (Edge Hill). SLS/194712
31/01/1949 Crewe Works Locomotives entering Works during January included Nos. C.D. No. 7, 2236, 2428/46/53/74, 2562/79/80/98, 2624/74/85/86, 4777, 4812/23/68/76, 4965, 5103/6/29/49, 5200/22/84/94, 5317/18/53/54/72/75/83, 5427/49, 5516/24/94/98, 5650/65/84, 5719, 6111/18/22/28/45/46/64, 6204/50, 7181, 7937/51/73/81/85, 8007/80/93/96, 8177/99, 8220/5, 8327/38/45/47, 8417/24/35/42, 8501/2, 8607/28/49, 8705/23/70, 8892/4, 8909/35, 9217/27/90, 9386, 25673, 27591, 27635, 28337, 42150, 42225, 42458, 42589, 42619, 44753/66, 44822/70, 45027/76, 45513/30/65/72/89, 45618/60/85, 45721, 46220/21/29/39, 46603, 48004, 48114, 49307. During the past month new construction accounted for a further six Class '5' 4-6-0's of Order E472. They were completed as follows:- Nos. 44729 (7/1), 44730 (12/1), 44731 (17/1), 44732 (24/1), 44733 (28/1) and 44734 (3/2); the last three engines of this order are already in an advanced state of completion. The latest 'Patriot' Class 4-6-0 to be rebuilt is No. 45522-completed on 21/1; at the present time no more are in hand.
Since the cessation of hostilities the former L.M.S.Rly. have fitted several different types of speedometer to certain of their 4-6-0 locomotives. These experiments were carried a stage further last month when during W.E. 22/1 Class '7P' No. 46257 was fitted with a Smiths type speedometer driven from the pony truck axle, the generator being mounted on the left-hand axlebox.
Ex L.N.W. 'Cauliflower' 0-6-0's. Nos. 58409/12 were fitted for snowplough duties during the same week. The equipment includes ex-tended cab roofs, and look-out windows (similar to those seen on many brake vans) mounted on the cab sides.
Since October last, several 'Dean' 0-6-0 pannier tanks have undergone heavy repairs here; those having passed through Works to date include Nos. 2021/67, 2100/09/11/15/27/50/84/85. All have had their numberplates painted red, with the numerals scoured bright. Another ex L. & Y. 0-6-0ST has been added to the stud of Works' shunting locomotives-No. 11444, which now brings the total of ex L. & Y. engines represented to three.
SLS/194903

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1923 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 739
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 5729
   
04/1928 Renumbered Renumbered to 7937    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (4B)    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 47937    
07/10/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 47937    

prev prev