Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 77 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 3096 Week
» 10280 Month
» 318261 Year
» 1202642 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4085   10/06/1925

Names Carried
Date From Name
10/06/1925 BERKELEY CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Wed 10/06/1925 to Laira (LA)
Withdrawal Wed 02/05/1962 off Old Oak Common (81A)
Scrapping During 10/1962 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 36 yrs, 10 mths , 22 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Churchward 3,500g 1645 05/1925 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Churchward 3,500g 1657 03/1927 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Collett 3,500g Intermediate 2375 07/1927 GWR 3,500g
Collett 4,000g 2386 12/06/1929 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2543 26/03/1930 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2590 06/07/1933 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2636 30/04/1937 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2704 27/09/1938 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2814 05/03/1940 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2813 08/07/1942 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2654 15/06/1944 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2823 06/06/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4003 12/12/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2584 13/10/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2583 09/10/1951 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2736 12/07/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2837 24/03/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2603 10/11/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4046 25/03/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2617 25/08/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 4018 23/05/1957 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2562 08/08/1958 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4037 18/08/1960 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2920 06/1962 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LA Laira (New) 10/06/1925
PDN Old Oak Common 01/04/1930
CARM Carmarthen 12/02/1932
LDR Landore m/e 06/1932
CARM Carmarthen m/e 07/1932
EXE Exeter 17/07/1934
PDN Old Oak Common 02/05/1937
RDG Reading (W.R.) m/e 01/1939
85A Worcester 15/04/1958
85B Gloucester Horton Road 20/05/1958
85A Worcester 18/02/1960
81A Old Oak Common 18/08/1960
   Withdrawn 02/05/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 19/04/1958
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 17/05/1958
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 26/03/1960
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 10/09/1960
WDN   m/e 31/05/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/06/1925 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4615)
25/10/1928 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4627)
26/03/1930 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4609)
04/02/1932 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4652)
07/12/1935 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4623)
27/09/1938 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4648)
15/06/1944 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4637)
06/06/1946 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6644)
17/09/1948 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4641)
13/10/1950 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6669)
24/03/1953 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6672)
25/08/1955 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6675)
08/08/1958 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6650)
18/08/1960 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6643)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 07/12/1926 12/03/1927 96 days Light Repair
Tender number 1657 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 20/06/1927 03/08/1927 45 days Light Repair
Tender number 2375 (Collett 3,500g Intermediate) attached.
 
Swindon Works 03/09/1928 02/11/1928 61 days Heavy
Boiler number 4627 (Diagram HA)
194218
Swindon Works 19/04/1929 17/06/1929 60 days Light Repair
Tender number 2386 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 27/01/1930 01/04/1930 65 days Heavy
Boiler number 4609 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2543 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
275299
Swindon Works 13/04/1931 04/06/1931 53 days Intermediate 355162
Swindon Works 15/12/1931 12/02/1932 60 days General
Boiler number 4652 (Diagram HA)
391726
Swindon Works 04/05/1933 07/1933   Intermediate  
Swindon Works 08/05/1934 17/07/1934 71 days Intermediate 525931
Swindon Works 23/10/1935 12/12/1935 51 days General
Boiler number 4623 (Diagram HA)
607538
Swindon Works 03/03/1937 02/05/1937 61 days Intermediate
Tender number 2636 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
687713
Swindon Works 04/04/1938 15/05/1938 42 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 16/08/1938 09/10/1938 55 days General
Boiler number 4648 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2704 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
766096
Swindon Works 22/01/1940 09/03/1940 48 days Intermediate
Tender number 2814 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
834446
Swindon Works 21/05/1942 09/07/1942 50 days Intermediate
Tender number 2813 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
919589
Swindon Works 25/04/1944 23/06/1944 60 days General
Boiler number 4637 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2654 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
992547
Swindon Works 01/05/1946 06/06/1946 37 days Intermediate
Boiler number 6644 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2823 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1066457
Swindon Works 08/11/1946 12/12/1946 35 days Light Repair
Tender number 4003 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 16/08/1948 17/09/1948 33 days General
Boiler number 4641 (Diagram HA)
1143279
Swindon Works 12/09/1950 13/10/1950 32 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6669 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2584 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1226606
Swindon Works 27/09/1951 09/10/1951 13 days Light Casual
Tender number 2583 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 11/02/1953 24/03/1953 42 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6672 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2837 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1316995
Swindon Works 17/09/1953 10/11/1953 55 days Light Casual
Tender number 2603 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 12/01/1955 25/03/1955 73 days Light Casual
Tender number 4046 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 25/06/1955 25/08/1955 62 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6675 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2617 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1393691
Swindon Works 05/11/1956 23/05/1957 200 days Heavy General
Tender number 4018 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 10/06/1958 08/08/1958 60 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6650 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2562 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1479446
Swindon Works 26/05/1960 18/08/1960 85 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6643 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4037 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
1569055

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1925 Tender Tender fitted: Churchward 3,500g number 1645    
10/06/1925 To Service To service as GWR Number 4085, name: BERKELEY CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Laira (LA)
Diagram HA boiler fitted
   
07/12/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/12/1926. Dep: 12/03/1927.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 1657 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
   
20/06/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/06/1927. Dep: 03/08/1927.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2375 (Collett 3,500g Intermediate) attached.
   
03/09/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 03/09/1928. Dep: 02/11/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4627 (Diagram HA)
   
19/04/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/04/1929. Dep: 17/06/1929.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2386 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
27/01/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 27/01/1930. Dep: 01/04/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4609 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2543 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
01/04/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)    
13/04/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 13/04/1931. Dep: 04/06/1931.    
15/12/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1931. Dep: 12/02/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4652 (Diagram HA)
   
12/02/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Carmarthen (CARM)    
06/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (LDR)    
07/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Carmarthen (CARM)    
04/05/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 04/05/1933. Dep: ?/07/1933.    
06/07/1933 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2590    
19/12/1933 Sightings This locomotive was working a Paddington - Fishguard express when it struck and killed a man on the down line near Swindon. The man was none other than George Jackson Churchward who had been checking a loose sleeper.    
08/05/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 08/05/1934. Dep: 17/07/1934.    
17/07/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Exeter (EXE)    
23/10/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1935. Dep: 12/12/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4623 (Diagram HA)
   
03/03/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 03/03/1937. Dep: 02/05/1937.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2636 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
02/05/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)    
04/04/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/04/1938. Dep: 15/05/1938.    
16/08/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1938. Dep: 09/10/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4648 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2704 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
01/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (RDG)    
22/01/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 22/01/1940. Dep: 09/03/1940.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2814 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
21/05/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 21/05/1942. Dep: 09/07/1942.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2813 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
25/04/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1944. Dep: 23/06/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4637 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2654 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
01/05/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 01/05/1946. Dep: 06/06/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6644 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2823 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
08/11/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/11/1946. Dep: 12/12/1946.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 4003 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
16/08/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1948. Dep: 17/09/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4641 (Diagram HA)
   
12/09/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 12/09/1950. Dep: 13/10/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6669 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2584 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
27/09/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/09/1951. Dep: 09/10/1951.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2583 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
12/07/1952 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2736    
11/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 11/02/1953. Dep: 24/03/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6672 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2837 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
17/09/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/09/1953. Dep: 10/11/1953.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2603 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
12/01/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/01/1955. Dep: 25/03/1955.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 4046 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
25/06/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 25/06/1955. Dep: 25/08/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6675 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2617 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
05/11/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 05/11/1956. Dep: 23/05/1957.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 4018 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
15/04/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
20/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
10/06/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 10/06/1958. Dep: 08/08/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6650 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2562 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
18/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
26/05/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/05/1960. Dep: 18/08/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6643 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4037 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
18/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
02/05/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 4085 from Old Oak Common (81A)    
06/1962 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2920    
10/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev