|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Swindon Works | 24/10/1927 | 23/12/1927 | 61 days | Heavy | Boiler number 4610 (Diagram HA) |
134759 | |
Swindon Works | 12/04/1929 | 27/06/1929 | 77 days | Heavy | Boiler number 4624 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2431 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
227147 | |
Swindon Works | 06/12/1929 | 27/12/1929 | 22 days | Light Repair | Tender number 1729 (Churchward 3,500g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 25/01/1930 | 16/04/1930 | 82 days | Heavy | Tender number 2538 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
269193 | |
Swindon Works | 15/04/1931 | 20/06/1931 | 67 days | General | Boiler number 4636 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2434 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
339212 | |
Swindon Works | 16/11/1932 | 01/1933 | Intermediate | ||||
Swindon Works | 20/11/1933 | 18/01/1934 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 4614 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2538 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
480863 | |
Swindon Works | 07/01/1935 | 04/1935 | Light Repair | ||||
Swindon Works | 08/10/1935 | 30/11/1935 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 4612 (Diagram HA) |
571261 | |
Swindon Works | 19/01/1937 | 22/03/1937 | 63 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2626 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
661357 | |
Swindon Works | 03/06/1937 | 24/06/1937 | 22 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2656 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 09/06/1938 | 20/08/1938 | 73 days | General | Boiler number 4618 (Diagram HA) |
742280 | |
Swindon Works | 01/05/1939 | 26/05/1939 | 26 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 02/11/1939 | 26/12/1939 | 55 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2580 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
815398 | |
Swindon Works | 17/01/1941 | 01/03/1941 | 44 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2562 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 24/02/1942 | 22/04/1942 | 58 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2819 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
924461 | |
Swindon Works | 16/09/1943 | 28/10/1943 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 6610 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2557 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1011158 | |
Swindon Works | 10/12/1945 | 17/01/1946 | 39 days | Intermediate | Boiler number 4660 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2542 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1107232 | |
Swindon Works | 17/10/1947 | 25/11/1947 | 40 days | Intermediate | Boiler number 4603 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2410 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1180246 | |
Swindon Works | 22/03/1948 | 14/04/1948 | 24 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 11/06/1948 | 01/07/1948 | 21 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2730 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 24/11/1948 | 03/12/1948 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 24/02/1949 | 18/03/1949 | 23 days | Light Casual | Tender number 2553 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 15/11/1949 | 20/12/1949 | 36 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6602 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2898 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1260119 | |
Swindon Works | 10/09/1951 | 19/10/1951 | 40 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6620 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2720 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1351521 | |
Swindon Works | 31/03/1952 | 02/05/1952 | 33 days | Light Casual | Tender number 2680 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 20/05/1953 | 03/07/1953 | 45 days | Heavy Intermediate | Tender number 2700 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1432895 | |
Swindon Works | 26/02/1955 | 12/04/1955 | 46 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 4636 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2606 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1511501 | |
Swindon Works | 23/12/1955 | 23/02/1956 | 63 days | Light Casual | Tender number 2726 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 23/10/1956 | 04/04/1957 | 164 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 7671 (Diagram HD) Tender number 4038 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. Double Chimney fitted |
1578437 | |
Swindon Works | 04/11/1958 | 01/01/1959 | 59 days | Heavy Intermediate | Tender number 2706 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1675365 | |
Swindon Works | 15/09/1960 | 07/11/1960 | 54 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 6688 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2801 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1768684 | |
Swindon Works | 29/04/1961 | 28/08/1961 | 122 days | Heavy Casual | Tender number 2567 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/09/1947 | Swindon Works | Locos. entering Works during September included:-907, 1011, 1012, 2054, 2066, 2262, 2737, 2804, 2814, 2826, 3014, 3036, 3562, 3809, 3840, 4033, 4054, 4090, 4092, 4920, 4929, 4930, 4944, 4983, 4985, 4997, 5041, 5052, 5056, 5060, 5061, 5065, 5076, 5080, 5086, 5905, 5912, 5938, 5991, 6808, 6831, 6876, 7817, 7819, W.D.77508 an 78542; the latter having been stored since last July. The following were ex Works as follows:-Nos. 6972 (4/10), 6973 (8/10), 6974 (14/10), 6975 (18/10), 6976 (29/10), 79274 (7/10), 78543 (16/10). Works' pilots recently have been Nos. 200, 242, 2723, 2731, 3561. | SLS/194712 |
31/03/1948 | Swindon Works | Locomotives entering Works during March included: Nos. 1006/16, 1434, 1861, 2943/44, 3015, 3803/53/60, 4012/16/23/26/30/35/77/90/94, 4803, 4941/98, 5006/09/25/59/68/80/97, 5339/50/78, 5901/07/48/83, 6011/13/19/22, 6318/20/22/65, 6903/20/23/42/51, 7001, 9089 an 9302. New work: Nos. 6986-89 and 0-6-0 Diesel-electric No. 15101, the latter with cast brass number plates and 'British Railways' on the sides; also numbers in 3' letters in the centre of the buffer beams. W.D. Nos. 77060/145/280/335, 79244 (all ex repair in Belgium) and 78624 arrived in the Works on 23/3 from Marston sidings. W.D. Nos. 77027 an 77165 are ex Works with G.W. type top feed and Wakefield lubricator. Works' pilots recently have been and are Nos. 198, 250, 410, 1713 an 2781; 905 ceased to work on these duties W/E 13/3 and has gone for scrapping. No. 1358 was in the Works W/E 13/3 for scrapping, while No. 3004 was cut up in the same week. No. 6022 LA went on the test plant on 18/3 for several days and is now being prepared to go to the L.N.E.R. Engines ex Works are now emerging without the prefix W. | SLS/194805 |
31/12/1948 | Swindon Works | New Work December: Nos. 6766 NEA (8/12), 6767 (21/12), 6768 (23/12); 6993 Arthog Hall WEY (4/12), 6994 Baggrave Hall EXE (9/12), 6995 Benthall Hall TN (17/12). Nos. 6993-95 are painted black and fully lined, while Nos. 6766-68 are black and unlined. Locomotives entering Works 29/11/48 to 24/12/48: These included Nos. 62 (condemned), 71 (condemned), 301 (condemned)-re-numbered from 201, 1020/21/22/24, 1400/07/44, 2068, 2414, 2833/37/94, 3430/31 (both condemned), 3614/74/82, 3724, 3808/17/21/38/59/64, 4038/39/80/90, 4087, 4112/50, 4274, 4353 (condemned), 4506/14/63/70/87, 4700, 4920/91, 5002/34/41/45/47/70/87, 5022, 5103, 5351/59/97, 5412/22, 5522/32, 5708/12, 5913/19/56/59/95, 6010/12/23, 6100/48/54, 6323/24/39/85, 6423, 6856, 6930/39/66, 7200/20/22, 7401, 7727, 9306, 9601/06. (4150 and 5022 were the locomotives that were involved in the Lapworth accident). On 16/12 the Stock Shed contained the following:-Nos. 5, 2906, 3012/15/17/18/23/41/44, 3453, 4017, 4168/69, 4914, 5153/83. Additional locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 5926 an 6947. 'Austerity' No. 77380 has been fitted with a smokebox numberplate (the first 'Austerity' to be so fitted here). 'Austerity' 2-8-0's to be fitted with standard G.W.R. fittings, which include Wakefield lubricator, G.W. type stuffing box and fountain, whistles, injectors, top feed and fire iron compartment, were ex Swindon Works as follows:-Nos. 77000 (19/5/48). 77027 (24/3/48), 77165 (13/4/48), 77291 (10/12/47), 77429 (9/6/48), 78542 (12/11/47), 79226 (6/9/48), 79278 (28/11/47). Frames are being cut for Lot 373. which, it is understood, is for some 0-6-0PT's with outside Walschaerts valve gear. | SLS/194902 |
10/10/1950 | Penzance | Early in October the allocation at Ponsandane was made up of one 'County' (1004), one 'Castle' (4090), nine 2-6-2T (4500, 4509, 4525, 4537, 4540, 4545, 4548, 4566, 4574), five 'Halls' (4946, 4965, 5915, 5969, 6911), one 2-6-0 (6318), ten 'Granges' (6800/1/6/8/9, 6817, 6825/6, 6838, 6869), one 'Manor' (7806) and two 0-6-OT (8409, 9717). 9717 shunts the goods yard and 8409 the station, but when 8409 was being washed-out, 2097 (83F) was borrowed; the latter was complete with emblem and red ground to numberplates. Engines from St. Blazey work in on certain trains where engines are changed at Par, and Truro and Laira engines have regular workings. The Plymouth train due at 11.50 a.m. has a Newton Abbot engine with a Laira crew, the engine and men returning on the 1.20 p.m. London Express. The first arrival is the 5.30 a.m. Kensington Empty Milk Vans, which has a Laira engine: this returns light or on seasonal traffic as ordered. Some turns are worked alternately by Laira and Penzance: such an example is the 7.10 parcels ex North Road, then 4.20 Penzance-Plymouth, and 8.9 p.m. Plymouth-Penzance, due 10.45 p.m. | SLS/195101 |
28/05/1961 | Swindon Works (Works Yard) | Gas Works: 4203, 5103/10/76, 9414. Stock Shed Yard: D817, D6319/21, 5815. Triangle: 1361/2/4, 1433, 1647, 3657/67/70/7, 3724, 5001, 6027, 6959, 8457, 8705, 9762. Works Yard: D804/38, D2144/88/91/6, D7000, 1029, 1501/2/9, 1604, 2516, 2884, 4090, 4950/72/8/85, 5022/97, 5949/58, 6004, 6937/62, 7007, 7221, 7304/40, 7761/75, 9400, 9749, 82031, 92226/45. Weigh House: D808, 4984. 'A' Shop: D602, D801/15/8/36/40/3/50/69/70, D1000-7, D2195/7-9, D2372-4, D3257, D6305/9, 3817, 4088, 4264/75, 4704, 4912/4/42/70/88/94, 5015/51/70/2/99, 5914/48/51/3/70/87, 6020, 6333/72, 6828/44/50, 6911/69/77/9, 7002/9/32/6, 7232/3, 13187, 13256/62, 15100/2, 82020/1, 92234. Dump: 1366, 1419/31/54/73, 2207/27, 3676, 5158/75/94, 5771/91, 6426, 7748, 8429, 8722/6/40/69/77, 9735/81. 'C' Shop: 5207, 8101. Field: 78001/8. | SLS/196107 |
23/07/1961 | Swindon Works ('A' Shop) | 'A' Shop: D602/4, D805/11/28/70, D1000-11, D2137, D2372-9, D3257, D3431, D3744, D6306/11/9, 13186, 13264/5, 15100/2, 2829, 3817/43, 4090, 4922/8/56/78, 5000/1/31/49/60, 5306/51, 5903/4/36/9/67, 6000/4/7, 6363/95, 6871, 6919/46/59/86/97/8, 7020, 7209/15/21/2, 7826, 82031, 92226/34. Works Yard: D804/15/23/41/51/2, D2188/9/94, 1604/34/47, 2516, 3667/70, 3822/41, 4003, 4203, 4916/98, 5015/80/1, 5103/10/76/7/95, 5336, 5949, 6027, 6349, 6831, 6969, 7745/56/75/98, 8789/98, 9400/14, 9749, 78001/8. 92215/45. Triangle: 6021, 9736/67. Dump: 1361/2/4/6, 1419/33, 3657/76, 3724, 6426, 7700/61, 8429, 8705/22/40/77/96, 9735/62/71/81. 'C' Shop: 8457 intact, Outside 'C' Shop: 5771, 8726 being cut up. | SLS/196109 |
14/05/1962 | Cardiff Canton MPD | By mid-May the following type 3 diesels had arrived-D7010, D7022/5/8-32. Although only diagrammed for the London main line, they have already appeared at Shrewsbury on the 1-13 p.m. Manchester and at Salisbury on the 12-50 p.m. Portsmouth. Four Neath Castles are stored at Canton, 4090, 5062, 5080 an 7028 whilst 5041/8 also scheduled to be stored at Canton are believed to be stored at Barry Works. | SLS/196206 |
09/12/1962 | Cardiff East Dock MPD | There is no diesel locomotive whatever here and CED is now a full main line shed for the first time in its life ! This must be unique in railway history and the steam phase is expected to last two years as Canton is being demolished completely to make way for a diesel shed and main diesel depot for S. Wales. On 9th December, 1962, the following were on shed-1613, 2875/97, 3662, 3782/4, 3804/10, 4090, 4242/72/82, 5043/74/81/97, 5220/4/5/9, 5749, 6606/37/81, 6813/32/75/6, 6918/32/45/56/72/7/87/95, 7016, 7913, 8425/97, 9426/37, 9629, 92003/236/44/6. | SLS/196302 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1925 | Tender | Tender fitted: Churchward 3,500g number 2228 | ||
15/08/1925 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 4090, name: DORCHESTER CASTLE Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Old Oak Common (PDN) Diagram HA boiler fitted |
||
24/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 24/10/1927. Dep: 23/12/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4610 (Diagram HA) |
||
12/04/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 12/04/1929. Dep: 27/06/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4624 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2431 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
06/12/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/12/1929. Dep: 27/12/1929. Work undertaken: Tender number 1729 (Churchward 3,500g) attached. |
||
25/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 25/01/1930. Dep: 16/04/1930. Work undertaken: Tender number 2538 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/04/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1931. Dep: 20/06/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4636 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2434 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
20/06/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Laira (LA) | ||
11/1932 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2399 | ||
16/11/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 16/11/1932. Dep: ?/01/1933. | ||
20/11/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1933. Dep: 18/01/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4614 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2538 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
18/01/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA) | ||
07/01/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/01/1935. Dep: ?/04/1935. | ||
04/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Penzance (PZ) | ||
08/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1935. Dep: 30/11/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4612 (Diagram HA) |
||
30/11/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN) | ||
19/01/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 19/01/1937. Dep: 22/03/1937. Work undertaken: Tender number 2626 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
22/03/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Laira (LA) | ||
03/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/06/1937. Dep: 24/06/1937. Work undertaken: Tender number 2656 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
04/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Exeter (EXE) | ||
05/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Laira (LA) | ||
09/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1938. Dep: 20/08/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4618 (Diagram HA) |
||
30/12/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA) | ||
10/01/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Laira (LA) | ||
10/01/1939 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2751 | ||
01/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/05/1939. Dep: 26/05/1939. | ||
02/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 02/11/1939. Dep: 26/12/1939. Work undertaken: Tender number 2580 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
17/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/01/1941. Dep: 01/03/1941. Work undertaken: Tender number 2562 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
24/02/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 24/02/1942. Dep: 22/04/1942. Work undertaken: Tender number 2819 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
16/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1943. Dep: 28/10/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6610 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2557 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
14/07/1945 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2438 | ||
10/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 10/12/1945. Dep: 17/01/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4660 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2542 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Laira (LA) | ||
17/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 17/10/1947. Dep: 25/11/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4603 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2410 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
22/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/03/1948. Dep: 14/04/1948. | ||
11/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/06/1948. Dep: 01/07/1948. Work undertaken: Tender number 2730 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
24/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/11/1948. Dep: 03/12/1948. | ||
24/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/02/1949. Dep: 18/03/1949. Work undertaken: Tender number 2553 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
23/04/1949 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2566 | ||
15/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 15/11/1949. Dep: 20/12/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6602 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2898 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Penzance (PZ) | ||
25/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Penzance (83G) | ||
10/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 10/09/1951. Dep: 19/10/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6620 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2720 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
31/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/03/1952. Dep: 02/05/1952. Work undertaken: Tender number 2680 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
29/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
20/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/05/1953. Dep: 03/07/1953. Work undertaken: Tender number 2700 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
03/07/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stafford Road (84A) | ||
26/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/02/1955. Dep: 12/04/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4636 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2606 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
12/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
23/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/12/1955. Dep: 23/02/1956. Work undertaken: Tender number 2726 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
23/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 23/10/1956. Dep: 04/04/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7671 (Diagram HD) Tender number 4038 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. Double Chimney fitted |
||
04/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 04/11/1958. Dep: 01/01/1959. Work undertaken: Tender number 2706 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
11/08/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Landore (87E) | ||
22/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G) | ||
16/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Landore (87E) | ||
15/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 15/09/1960. Dep: 07/11/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6688 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2801 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
22/04/1961 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2737 | ||
29/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 29/04/1961. Dep: 28/08/1961. Work undertaken: Tender number 2567 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
28/08/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) | ||
17/04/1962 | To Store | To Store at Neath (Court Sart) (87A) | ||
14/07/1962 | Reinstated | Reinstated to Shrewsbury (89A) | ||
07/09/1962 | To Store | To Store at Shrewsbury (89A) | ||
24/09/1962 | Reinstated | Reinstated to Cardiff East Dock (88L) | ||
06/06/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 4090 from Cardiff East Dock (88L) | ||
06/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |