Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 30 Online
» 4487 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 20099 Week
» 118744 Month
» 321408 Year
» 3348261 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4104 |
on |
31/08/1935 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
5101 |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
292 |
To Service |
Thu 31/08/1935 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 14/05/1964 |
Service Life |
28 yrs, 8 mths , 13 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/08/1935 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4104 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stourbridge Junction (STB) |
|
|
14/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (85A) |
|
|
06/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
14/05/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4104 |
|
|
07/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|