Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 95 Today
» 921 Yesterday
» 4564 Week
» 5454 Month
» 313435 Year
» 1197816 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4127 m/e 05/1938

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 5101
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 05/1938
Withdrawal 4w/e Sat 09/02/1963
Scrapping During 05/1963 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 24 yrs, 9 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
84E Tyseley 8w/e 20/04/1957
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 02/11/1957
   Withdrawn 4w/e 09/02/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 23/03/1957
LOAN 84E Tyseley m/e 30/04/1957
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 18/05/1957
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 02/11/1957
WDN   4w/e 09/02/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1938 To Service To service as GWR Number 4127
Built at Swindon Works
   
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (84E)    
02/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
09/02/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 4127    
05/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev