Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 908 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14314 Week
» 67330 Month
» 186857 Year
» 3213710 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4146 |
on |
21/09/1946 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
5101 |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
335 |
To Service |
Thu 21/09/1946 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 16/08/1962 |
Service Life |
15 yrs, 10 mths , 26 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/09/1946 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4146 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stourbridge Junction (STB) |
|
|
26/01/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
18/05/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F) |
|
|
03/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (84B) |
|
|
30/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
14/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E) |
|
|
16/08/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4146 |
|
|
02/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|