Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 345 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18148 Week
» 71164 Month
» 190691 Year
» 3217544 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4209 |
m/e |
02/1912 |
Great Western Railway (Rblds) |
7249 |
on |
25/11/1938 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
42xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-8-0T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
187 |
Works Number |
2453 |
To Service |
During 02/1912 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 16/06/1965 |
Service Life |
53 yrs, 4 mths , 16 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1912 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4209 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2453 |
|
|
25/11/1938 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7249 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ebbw Junction (Newport) (NPT ) |
|
|
24/04/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxford (81F) |
|
|
22/05/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A) |
|
|
17/07/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
04/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A) |
|
|
23/04/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (87B) |
|
|
15/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B) |
|
|
11/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88A) |
|
|
16/05/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
16/06/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7249 |
|
|
05/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Morriston |
|
|