Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 291 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 2630 Week
» 8764 Month
» 236648 Year
» 1458213 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4212 m/e 08/1912

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 42xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-8-0T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 187
Works Number 2456
To Service During 08/1912
Withdrawal Mon 15/06/1959
Scrapping Sun 28/02/1960 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 46 yrs, 10 mths , 15 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1912
84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 21/03/1959
   Withdrawn 15/06/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DYD Duffryn Yard m/e 30/04/1948
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 21/03/1959
WDN   m/e 30/06/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1912 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 4212
Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2456
   
21/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
15/06/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 4212    

prev prev