Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1957 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19760 Week
» 72776 Month
» 192303 Year
» 3219156 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4221 |
m/e |
12/1912 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
42xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-8-0T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
187 |
Works Number |
2465 |
To Service |
During 12/1912 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 10/09/1959 |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 9 mths , 11 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Sun 28/02/1960 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1912 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4221 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2465 |
|
|
01/12/1945 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Neath (Court Sart) (NEA ) |
|
|
16/07/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D) |
|
|
04/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
10/09/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4221 |
|
|
28/02/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|