Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1438 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14844 Week
» 67860 Month
» 187387 Year
» 3214240 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4222 |
m/e |
11/1913 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
42xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-8-0T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
196 |
Works Number |
2541 |
To Service |
During 11/1913 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 09/10/1964 |
Service Life |
50 yrs, 11 mths , 8 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1913 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4222 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2541 |
|
|
01/12/1945 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Aberbeeg (ABEEG) |
|
|
31/03/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF) |
|
|
21/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberbeeg (ABEEG) |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) |
|
|
14/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberbeeg (86H) |
|
|
31/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberbeeg (86H) |
|
|
14/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tondu (86F) |
|
|
30/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tondu (86F) |
|
|
04/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llantrisant (88G) |
|
|
09/10/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4222 |
|
|
02/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|