Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 331 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18134 Week
» 71150 Month
» 190677 Year
» 3217530 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4239 |
m/e |
10/1914 |
Great Western Railway (Rblds) |
7240 |
m/e |
08/1937 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
42xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-8-0T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
200 |
Works Number |
2594 |
To Service |
During 10/1914 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 07/09/1964 |
Service Life |
49 yrs, 11 mths , 8 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1914 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4239 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2594 |
|
|
08/1937 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7240 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Oxley (OXY) |
|
|
26/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (WOS) |
|
|
21/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
30/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (87B) |
|
|
05/09/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
17/05/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
29/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G) |
|
|
07/09/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7240 |
|
|
01/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|