Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 614 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 3202 Week
» 32700 Month
» 369546 Year
» 1591111 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 910 m/e 09/1890
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 6601 m/e 11/1927
British Railways 46601 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 1P
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 3152
To Service During 09/1890
Withdrawal w/e Sat 05/12/1953
Scrapping During y/e 1954
Service Life 63 yrs, 3 mths , 4 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1890
4A Shrewsbury on 01/01/1948
2A Rugby 4w/e 16/05/1953
1E Bletchley 8w/e 11/07/1953
2A Rugby 4w/e 31/10/1953
   Withdrawn w/e 05/12/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 2C Northampton w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC 4A Shrewsbury w/e 01/11/1947
ALLOC 4B Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) w/e 05/06/1948
LOAN 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) w/e 18/09/1948
LOAN 2B Bletchley w/e 09/10/1948
ALLOC 2B Bletchley w/e 23/10/1948
ALLOC 2A Rugby 4w/e 16/05/1953
LOAN 1E Bletchley 4w/e 13/06/1953
EXLOAN 2A Rugby 4w/e 31/10/1953
WDN   w/e 05/12/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1947 Market Harborough Station Recent unusual visitors have included L.N.E.R. 'B16/3' 1421 YK on 24/6 and 'K3' 1899 on 8/7, both at the head of specials carrying European Volunteer Workers. Although the line from Nottingham via Melton Mowbray is G.N. and L.N.W. Joint, the L.M.S. normally works all traffic South of John O'Gaunt. The locomotives were turned on the L.N.W. turntable and returned North with the empty stock. On 8/7 the 8.3 a.m. arrival from Rugby was worked by L.M.S. 28450 . This local passenger working is more usually in the hands of one of the Harborough 4F's or L.N.W. 0-8-0's. With the departure of 6601 , the 6.25 a.m. to Rugby and the 5.40 p.m. ex Rugby are now worked by a variety of locomotives ranging from 2-6-2T to Stanier Class 5's. The latter train now runs, unadvertised, to East Norton for the benefit of local factory workers, returning as empty stock. SLS/194709

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1890 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 910
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3152
   
11/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 6601    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Shrewsbury (4A)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 46601    
16/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
11/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (1E)    
31/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
05/12/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 46601    

prev