Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 689 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 3277 Week
» 32775 Month
» 369621 Year
» 1591186 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 459 m/e 02/1891
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 6603 m/e 11/1926
British Railways 46603 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 1P
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 3154
To Service During 02/1891
Withdrawal w/e Sat 21/07/1951
Scrapping During y/e 1951
Service Life 60 yrs, 5 mths , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1891
8B Warrington Dallam on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn w/e 21/07/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   w/e 21/07/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/08/1948 Broadheath-Lymm-Warrington Section The local passenger service to and from Manchester (London Road) continues to be worked mainly by Fowler and Stanier 2-6-2T's, Stanier 2-6-4T's, ex L. & Y. 2-4-2T's and Class '2' 4-4-0 No. 674. The latter makes one 'afternoon trip from Warrington to London Road and back. Morning turns are usually handled by 2-6-2T's Nos. 2, 6 o 7 and one of the three ex-L. & Y. 2-4-2T's (Nos. 10697, 10703 or 10705). No. 71 (9A) is the most regular Stanier 2-6-2T, and 2606 (BA) the most usual 2-6-4T on duty. A couple of trips from Warrington to Broadheath and back are usually sandwiched in between its other duties by the Hartford motor train which is pushed or pulled by Webb 2-4-2T No. 6603 o 6668. The fairly heavy freight traffic is shared fairly equally between ex L.N.W. 0-8-0's and Class '8F' 2-8-0's, while the working of the Arpley-Broadheath tranships train is invariably entrusted to one of the several ex Midland Class '3' 0-6-0's shedded at Warrington SLS/194810
31/01/1949 Crewe Works Locomotives entering Works during January included Nos. C.D. No. 7, 2236, 2428/46/53/74, 2562/79/80/98, 2624/74/85/86, 4777, 4812/23/68/76, 4965, 5103/6/29/49, 5200/22/84/94, 5317/18/53/54/72/75/83, 5427/49, 5516/24/94/98, 5650/65/84, 5719, 6111/18/22/28/45/46/64, 6204/50, 7181, 7937/51/73/81/85, 8007/80/93/96, 8177/99, 8220/5, 8327/38/45/47, 8417/24/35/42, 8501/2, 8607/28/49, 8705/23/70, 8892/4, 8909/35, 9217/27/90, 9386, 25673, 27591, 27635, 28337, 42150, 42225, 42458, 42589, 42619, 44753/66, 44822/70, 45027/76, 45513/30/65/72/89, 45618/60/85, 45721, 46220/21/29/39, 46603, 48004, 48114, 49307. During the past month new construction accounted for a further six Class '5' 4-6-0's of Order E472. They were completed as follows:- Nos. 44729 (7/1), 44730 (12/1), 44731 (17/1), 44732 (24/1), 44733 (28/1) and 44734 (3/2); the last three engines of this order are already in an advanced state of completion. The latest 'Patriot' Class 4-6-0 to be rebuilt is No. 45522-completed on 21/1; at the present time no more are in hand.
Since the cessation of hostilities the former L.M.S.Rly. have fitted several different types of speedometer to certain of their 4-6-0 locomotives. These experiments were carried a stage further last month when during W.E. 22/1 Class '7P' No. 46257 was fitted with a Smiths type speedometer driven from the pony truck axle, the generator being mounted on the left-hand axlebox.
Ex L.N.W. 'Cauliflower' 0-6-0's. Nos. 58409/12 were fitted for snowplough duties during the same week. The equipment includes ex-tended cab roofs, and look-out windows (similar to those seen on many brake vans) mounted on the cab sides.
Since October last, several 'Dean' 0-6-0 pannier tanks have undergone heavy repairs here; those having passed through Works to date include Nos. 2021/67, 2100/09/11/15/27/50/84/85. All have had their numberplates painted red, with the numerals scoured bright. Another ex L. & Y. 0-6-0ST has been added to the stud of Works' shunting locomotives-No. 11444, which now brings the total of ex L. & Y. engines represented to three.
SLS/194903
31/03/1949 Warrington The motor trains between Warrington and Timperley are regularly worked by Webb 2-4-2T No. 46603, but during the last week of March this engine has been working through to Manchester (London Road) on certain afternoon passenger turns from Warrington. SLS/194905

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1891 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 459
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3154
   
11/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 6603    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Warrington Dallam (8B)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 46603    
21/07/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 46603    

prev prev