Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 37 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 2625 Week
» 32123 Month
» 368969 Year
» 1590534 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 2130 m/e 09/1893
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 6654 m/e 08/1928
British Railways 46654 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 1P
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 3400
To Service During 09/1893
Withdrawal w/e Sat 12/09/1953
Scrapping During y/e 1953
Service Life 60 yrs , 12 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1893
3B Bushbury on 01/01/1948
2C Warwick 4w/e 22/03/1952
   Withdrawn w/e 12/09/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 3B Bushbury w/e 25/10/1947
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 24/09/1949
ALLOC 2C Warwick 4w/e 22/03/1952
WDN   w/e 12/09/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1948 Crewe Works New Work December: 'IV° more '2F' 2-6-0's were completed dunng December-Nos. 46433 and 46434 on 8/12 and 13/12 respectively, thus completing the present order. Tne last Caprotti 4-6-0 of Order E 468, No. 44757, was completed on 22/12. No. 44728 (No. 11 of Order E 472) was completed on 31/12; the first ten of this order are to be built at Horwich. Another 'Patriot' Class 4-6-0, No. 45534, has been rebuilt with a taper boiler-completed on 10/12. No. 45522 will shortly be similarly dealt with.
Locomotives entering Works during December included: Nos. 1201, 2254, 2438/51/61/77/82, 2654/60/86/99, 2610/14/18/28/44/48/78/82, 4739/48/49, 4849/84, 4908/17/18/31/50/81, 5000/24/41/55/59/68/93, 5108/40/47, 5274/93, 4387, 5404/44/94, 5508/33/46, 5617/30/33/36/54/55/66/78, 5705, 6115/19/37/47/50/52/56, 6207/31/49/53, 6654, 6656(27A), 6727, 7757, 7803, 7987/99, 8001/63/93/98, 8143/89/97, 8200/71/80, 8373, 8409/17/39/62, 8509/20, 8606/34/51/53/59/96, 8700/03/18, 9072/85, 9122/26/64/84, 924/57/67/93, 9321/33/49, 9416/19/47, 28093, 42386, 42565, 44766, 44830, 45005/80, 46107/12/17/20/21, 47977, 49059, 49298, 58924. During w/e 8/12, No. 46121 was renamed The Highland Light Infantry (Glasgow Regiment) and fitted with a plaque.
SLS/194902

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1893 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2130
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3400
   
08/1928 Renumbered Renumbered to 6654    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bushbury (3B)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 46654    
22/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Warwick (2C)    
12/09/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 46654    

prev prev