Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 208 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 5325 Week
» 25767 Month
» 362613 Year
» 1584178 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 2132 m/e 09/1893
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 6656 m/e 03/1927
British Railways 46656 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 1P
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 3402
To Service During 09/1893
Withdrawal During 02/1952
Scrapping During 04/1952
Service Life 58 yrs , 5 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1893
27C Hamilton (West) on 01/01/1948
12G Dumfries 3w/e 11/12/1948
68D Beattock 4w/e 16/07/1949
   Withdrawn m/e 02/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 27C Hamilton (West) 4w/e 27/04/1946
ALLOC 27A Polmadie w/e 31/01/1948
ALLOC 12G Dumfries w/e 27/11/1948
ALLOC 68D Beattock w/e 09/07/1949
WDN   on 01/03/1952

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/09/1947 St Rollox Works Ex. Highland 4-6-0 No. 103 was taken into the Erecting Shop on 2/9 presumably for reconditioning; the coupling and connecting rods, boiler mountings, etc., have been in the works for some considerable time but this was the first movement of the actual loco. No. 6656 (27C) arrived on 20/8. This is the first L. & N.W. loco. to be repaired here. SLS/194710
31/12/1948 Crewe Works New Work December: 'IV° more '2F' 2-6-0's were completed dunng December-Nos. 46433 and 46434 on 8/12 and 13/12 respectively, thus completing the present order. Tne last Caprotti 4-6-0 of Order E 468, No. 44757, was completed on 22/12. No. 44728 (No. 11 of Order E 472) was completed on 31/12; the first ten of this order are to be built at Horwich. Another 'Patriot' Class 4-6-0, No. 45534, has been rebuilt with a taper boiler-completed on 10/12. No. 45522 will shortly be similarly dealt with.
Locomotives entering Works during December included: Nos. 1201, 2254, 2438/51/61/77/82, 2654/60/86/99, 2610/14/18/28/44/48/78/82, 4739/48/49, 4849/84, 4908/17/18/31/50/81, 5000/24/41/55/59/68/93, 5108/40/47, 5274/93, 4387, 5404/44/94, 5508/33/46, 5617/30/33/36/54/55/66/78, 5705, 6115/19/37/47/50/52/56, 6207/31/49/53, 6654, 6656(27A), 6727, 7757, 7803, 7987/99, 8001/63/93/98, 8143/89/97, 8200/71/80, 8373, 8409/17/39/62, 8509/20, 8606/34/51/53/59/96, 8700/03/18, 9072/85, 9122/26/64/84, 924/57/67/93, 9321/33/49, 9416/19/47, 28093, 42386, 42565, 44766, 44830, 45005/80, 46107/12/17/20/21, 47977, 49059, 49298, 58924. During w/e 8/12, No. 46121 was renamed The Highland Light Infantry (Glasgow Regiment) and fitted with a plaque.
SLS/194902
20/08/1951 Beattock Two standard Class 4F 0-6-0 are on loan from 68A for banking duties, one of which (No. 44008) hae a tender cab. The Moffat branch is worked by Webb 2-4-2T 46656 (L.N.W. 2132, 6/93). SLS/195111

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1893 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2132
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3402
   
03/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 6656    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hamilton (West) (27C)    
11/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Dumfries (12G)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 46656    
16/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Beattock (68D)    
02/1952 Withdrawn Condemned as 46656    

prev prev