Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 297 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18100 Week
» 71116 Month
» 190643 Year
» 3217496 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
2134 |
m/e |
09/1893 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
6658 |
m/e |
05/1928 |
British Railways |
46658 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
1P |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
3404 |
To Service |
During 09/1893 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 09/12/1950 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 3 mths , 8 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1951 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1893 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2134 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3404 |
|
|
05/1928 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6658 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Rhyl (7D) |
|
|
17/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (7A) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 46658 |
|
|
10/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10E) |
|
|
09/12/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46658 |
|
|
1951 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|