Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 121 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 2709 Week
» 32207 Month
» 369053 Year
» 1590618 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 2217 m/e 09/1893
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 6686 m/e 04/1928
British Railways 46686 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 1P
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 3419
To Service During 09/1893
Withdrawal Sat 22/05/1948
Scrapping During 07/1948
Service Life 54 yrs, 8 mths , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1893
1C Watford on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn on 22/05/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 1C Watford 5w/e 02/03/1946
ALLOC 1C Watford 4w/e 30/03/1946
WDN   w/e 22/05/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1947 Watford Area Watford, having lost all the ex L.N.W.R. 0-6-2T's viz: Nos. 6869, 6871, and 6909, their miscellaneous duties are now performed by the three 2-6-2T's Nos. 10, 20, and 43. The latter have consequently been taken off their regular work on the St. Albans branch, which is now in the hands of 2-4-2T's Nos. 6686, 6725 and 6729. These are the only Webb engines still left in the London area. The Stanmore branch is operated-by the two 0-4-4T's Nos. 1908 and 1909. The two Jinty's (Nos. 7327 and 7359) which were recently at Watford for several months, have now returned to Willesden. Apart from the still numerous 0-8-0's ex L.N.W.R. engines are now extremely rare on the old L.N.W.R. main line. The last 'Claughton' No. 6004 has made two appearances in London, on 3rd February and again on 18th March. The 'Princes' at Bletchley work mainly on the Oxford and Cambridge branches and seldom come to London since their last regular turn, the 6.35 a.m. ex Bletchley returning with 5.25 p.m. ex Euston, was turned over to a class 5 working at the end of last year. The poor old 'Princes' in their present deplorable state of maintenance could not keep time with the somewhat smartly timed 5.25 p.m., invariably losing anything from 5 to 20 minutes, according to the particular engine and the enthusiasm-or lack of it-of the driver. As a regular traveller by this train one cannot really regret their replacement, apart from the sentimental aspect. SLS/194706

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1893 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2217
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3419
   
04/1928 Renumbered Renumbered to 6686    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Watford (1C)    
22/05/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 6686    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 46686 but not taken up    

prev prev