Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 145 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 5262 Week
» 25704 Month
» 362550 Year
» 1584115 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 680 m/e 02/1895
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 6711 m/e 08/1928
British Railways 46711 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 1P
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 3497
To Service During 02/1895
Withdrawal During 05/1949
Scrapping During y/e 1949
Service Life 54 yrs, 2 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1895
5A Crewe North on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 1C Watford w/e 01/05/1948
ALLOC 2C Northampton w/e 28/08/1948
ALLOC 2E Warwick w/e 06/11/1948
WDN   w/e 21/05/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1895 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 680
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3497
   
08/1928 Renumbered Renumbered to 6711    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Crewe North (5A)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 46711 but not taken up    
05/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 6711    

prev prev