Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1234 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 6351 Week
» 26793 Month
» 363639 Year
» 1585204 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 847 m/e 02/1895
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 6712 m/e 08/1928
British Railways 46712 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 1P
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 3498
To Service During 02/1895
Withdrawal Sat 14/08/1954
Scrapping During y/e 1954
Service Life 59 yrs, 6 mths , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1895
7D Rhyl on 01/01/1948
2A Rugby 4w/e 29/12/1951
3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 23/02/1952
2C Warwick 8w/e 19/06/1954
   Withdrawn on 14/08/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) w/e 17/01/1948
ALLOC 2A Rugby 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 2C Warwick 4w/e 12/06/1954
WDN   on 14/08/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1895 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 847
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3498
   
08/1928 Renumbered Renumbered to 6712    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Rhyl (7D)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 46712    
29/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
23/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Warwick (2C)    
14/08/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 46712    

prev prev