Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 83 Today
» 1279 Yesterday
» 7752 Week
» 83 Month
» 374096 Year
» 1595661 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1383 m/e 04/1897
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 6740 m/e 04/1926
British Railways 46740 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 1P
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 3758
To Service During 04/1897
Withdrawal Sat 08/05/1948
Scrapping During 05/1948
Service Life 51 yrs, 1 mth , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1897
4B Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn on 08/05/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 4B Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 5w/e 02/03/1946
WDN   w/e 08/05/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1947 Carmarthen Carmarthen-Llandilo Section (ex L.N.W.R.): No trace now exists of the old L.N.W.R. shed at Carmarthen and the site is much overgrown. Since it was closed the ex L.N.W.R. 2-4-2T's working the branch, have been housed at the G.W.R. shed, but at the week-ended 27/12 only two were allocated: Nos. 6620 an 6740. For some time the L.M.S.R. foot-plate staff have been using G.W.R. locomotives on the branch-usually the 2200 Class or Pannier Tanks from Carmarthen shed, Thus the new era has been somewhat forestalled in this area! Undoubtedly the ex L.N.W.R. locomotives will soon depart from this one-time outpost; it is interesting to recall that before 1912, L.N.W.R. 2-4-2T's had to handle the Salop-Swansea passenger trains! SLS/194802
31/03/1948 Swansea Area During Easter L.M.S. No. 6620 (4B) ex L.N.W. 2-4-2T was noted on Pontardulais 'motor' trains prior to its return to Carmarthen: the latter shed (GW) had only L.M.S. No. 6740 for the Llandilo branch but G.W. engines were also being used by L.M.S. men. On Upper Bank shed (ex M.R.) were L.M.S. No. 28543 (4B) (ex L.N.W. 18' 0-6-0), and L.M.S. No. 22907 (2D) (ex M.R. 0-6-0)-both on loan. SLS/194805

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1897 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1383
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3758
   
04/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 6740    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (4B)    
08/05/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 6740    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 46740 but not taken up    

prev prev