Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 365 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18168 Week
» 71184 Month
» 190711 Year
» 3217564 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4255 |
m/e |
04/1917 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
42xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-8-0T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
203 |
Works Number |
2645 |
To Service |
During 04/1917 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 20/04/1964 |
Service Life |
47 yrs , 20 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
18/05/1963 |
Wolverhampton (Stafford Road) Works (Waiting Works) |
In Works1424, 3607(84G), 3763, 4132/55, 4278, 4646/80, 5263, 5938/75, 6690(88J), 6900/04/16/60/88, 7210, 9790/4. Waiting Works: L92 (ex-5786), 2896, 4255, 6648. Ex Works: 8400, 6134. |
SLS/196304 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1917 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4255 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2645 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Duffryn Yard (DYD) |
|
|
30/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF) |
|
|
27/02/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdare (86J) |
|
|
03/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
13/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B) |
|
|
20/04/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4255 |
|
|
01/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|