Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 614 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18417 Week
» 71433 Month
» 190960 Year
» 3217813 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4258 |
m/e |
05/1917 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
42xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-8-0T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
203 |
Works Number |
2648 |
To Service |
During 05/1917 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 21/04/1965 |
Service Life |
47 yrs, 11 mths , 22 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1917 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4258 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2648 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newport Pill (PILL) |
|
|
02/11/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberbeeg (86H) |
|
|
25/01/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newport Pill (86B) |
|
|
05/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
04/05/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newport Pill (86B) |
|
|
29/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
02/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
12/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdare (88J) |
|
|
07/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E) |
|
|
21/04/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4258 |
|
|
09/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|