|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
09/12/1961 | Horwich Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D4112 (finished), D4113/4 (engines in), D4115/6 (frames), 12004/20/7, 42702/17, 42827, 42953/82, 43007/52, 43856, 43976, 44056/146/277, 44342/52/67/73, 44602, 48136/64, 48634, 48741, 76051/79, Wren. Car Erecting Shop: uM28219/348/590, uM29023/249/575/655/723. Casual Repair Shop: 43009, 48522/36, 48717. Diesel Test House: 12014. Works Yard: 40132, 42703/63, 42862/3, 42983, 44152, 44481, 44564, 48201, 48333/8, 48423, 48558, 48770, uM28321M, uM29555M-both damaged. Paint Shop: D4111 (new), 42799, uM28394, uM29141, uM29836, LYR 1008, FR 3. Scrap Yard: 51419, 51537 (being cut up), 42893 (remains). Works Shunters: 47402/29, 11304/5/24/68. | SLS/196201 |
28/02/1962 | Lancaster Green Ayre MPD | Lancaster shed has acquired four unrebuilt Patriots (45505/7/10/8) to cover three turns previously performed by BR standard 4MTs which have been re-transferred to Springs Branch. Its Ivatt 2-6-0s (43007/52/112/3/5) have been transferred mainly to Nuneaton in exchange for Horwich moguls. | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/07/1950 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 43052 Built at Doncaster Works |
||
07/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
21/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (50C) | ||
16/05/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltley (21A) | ||
11/07/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J) | ||
17/10/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) | ||
07/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) | ||
17/09/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J) | ||
17/02/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) | ||
16/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Northampton (2E) | ||
05/11/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 43052 | ||
02/1967 | Scrapped | Scrapped |