Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 987 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18790 Week
» 71806 Month
» 191333 Year
» 3218186 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
43067 |
on |
14/12/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
4MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
Sun 14/12/1950 to New England (35A) |
Withdrawal |
Sun 11/04/1965 |
Service Life |
14 yrs, 3 mths , 28 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/12/1950 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 43067 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
21/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (34E) |
|
|
25/09/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
30/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) |
|
|
11/04/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43067 |
|
|
07/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|