Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2811 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16217 Week
» 69233 Month
» 188760 Year
» 3215613 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
43110 |
on |
14/06/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
4MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
Sat 14/06/1951 to South Lynn (31D) |
Withdrawal |
Sat 28/12/1963 |
Service Life |
12 yrs, 6 mths , 14 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1964 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
31D |
South Lynn |
on |
14/06/1951 |
ALLOC |
31C |
Kings Lynn |
4w/e |
13/07/1957 |
ALLOC |
31D |
South Lynn |
4w/e |
07/09/1957 |
ALLOC |
40F |
Boston |
4w/e |
21/03/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
28/12/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/06/1951 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 43110 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to South Lynn (31D) |
|
|
20/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
21/09/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to South Lynn (31D) |
|
|
07/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Boston (40F) |
|
|
28/12/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43110 |
|
|
10/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|