Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 894 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14300 Week
» 67316 Month
» 186843 Year
» 3213696 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
43142 |
on |
22/08/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
4MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
Sat 22/08/1951 to South Lynn (31D) |
Withdrawal |
Sat 28/12/1963 |
Service Life |
12 yrs, 4 mths , 6 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/08/1951 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 43142 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to South Lynn (31D) |
|
|
07/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Boston (40F) |
|
|
06/05/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |
|
|
27/05/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Boston (40F) |
|
|
28/12/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43142 |
|
|
06/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|