Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 282 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14325 Week
» 79279 Month
» 281943 Year
» 3308796 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
43150 |
on |
07/11/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
4MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
Sun 07/11/1951 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 03/01/1965 |
Service Life |
13 yrs, 1 mth , 27 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1965 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
07/11/1951 |
30A |
|
Stratford |
w/e |
07/03/1959 |
34E |
|
New England |
w/e |
06/02/1960 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
03/01/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/11/1951 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 43150 Built at Doncaster Works |
|
|
07/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
06/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
03/01/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43150 |
|
|
03/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|