Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 887 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18690 Week
» 71706 Month
» 191233 Year
» 3218086 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
43156 |
on |
07/01/1952 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/01/1952 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 43156 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Melton Constable (32G) |
|
|
16/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth Beach (32F) |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth Beach (32F) |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Melton Constable (32G) |
|
|
18/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Melton Constable (32G) |
|
|
07/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
13/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
10/01/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43156 |
|
|
04/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|