Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2625 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16031 Week
» 69047 Month
» 188574 Year
» 3215427 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
43161 |
on |
03/09/1952 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
4MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
Sun 03/09/1952 to Yarmouth Beach (32F) |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 20/06/1965 |
Service Life |
12 yrs, 9 mths , 17 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/09/1952 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 43161 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Yarmouth Beach (32F) |
|
|
21/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (34E) |
|
|
24/07/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth Beach (32F) |
|
|
07/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
03/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H) |
|
|
18/02/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (41B) |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
09/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) |
|
|
20/06/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43161 |
|
|
08/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|