Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 893 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14299 Week
» 67315 Month
» 186842 Year
» 3213695 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
6418 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
British Railways |
46418 |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
2MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
During 03/1947 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 21/01/1967 |
Service Life |
19 yrs, 10 mths , 24 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1947 |
26A |
|
Newton Heath |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
21/01/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
12/06/1948 |
Bank Top MPD |
Ex L.M.S. Nos. 6418/19 arrived at Bank Top shed W/E 12/6/48. No. 6418 is at present working from West Auckland and No. 6419 from Darlington over the summit to Kirkby Stephen on tests. |
SLS/194808 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1947 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 6418 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
28/02/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 46418 |
|
|
21/01/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46418 |
|
|
09/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|