Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 86 Today
» 1260 Yesterday
» 3685 Week
» 9819 Month
» 237703 Year
» 1459268 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 2212 on 14/12/1945
BR 42212 w/e 18/12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Fairburn
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 14/12/1945
Withdrawal Sat 21/08/1965
Scrapping During 12/1965 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 19 yrs, 8 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 14/12/1945
24B Rose Grove 4w/e 22/06/1946
30C Ardrossan 01/01/1948
67A Corkerhill 8w/e 09/09/1951
67D Ardrossan 4w/e 06/10/1951
6A Chester (MR) w/e 06/02/1960
9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 26/06/1965
   Withdrawn 21/08/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 23D Wigan Central (L&Y) 4w/e 30/03/1946
LOAN 30C Ardrossan w/e 12/04/1947
ALLOC 30C Ardrossan w/e 10/05/1947
ALLOC 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 08/09/1951
ALLOC 67D Ardrossan 4w/e 06/10/1951
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 27/02/1960
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 09/04/1960
ALLOC 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 10/07/1965
WDN   w/e 21/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/10/1949 Kilmarnock Works Locomotives entering Works during October: These included Nos. 40189, 669, 42212, 42400, 42833, 43996, 44325, 5466, 54456, 54638, 16338, 57618. SLS/194912
04/11/1951 3 cylinder 2-6-4T\'s in Scotland Regarding the arrival of 3 cylinder 2-6-4's in West of Scotland, the first to arrive was 42535, still with L.M.S. on tanks which was sent to Ardrossan, though bearing 67A shed plate. It ran on the morning Express from Largs to Glasgow for about 5-6 weeks, until so many protests were made, including letters to the daily papers, that it was taken off, and returned to 67A, 42212 being sent back to 67D. 42535 was unable to do the 42 mile run without an emergency stop for water, which lost time every day. Apart from that, it seemed good enough. We believe it is now at 66D. We have never seen 42530 out of St. Enoch. SLS/195201
12/10/1962 Derby Works (Paint Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: ED3, D36, D46, D73, D87, D100/31/44/88, D5011/30/79, D5136, 10001. Test House: D75, D5033. Outside Test House: D45, D66, D77, D93/4, D165 (loco. that was turned on its side on strike day), D185, D3056, D5021/75. Outside Shunter Test House: ED6, D2236, D3292. New Building : D184, D190-D193, D5186-5191. Finishing Shop: D38, D186/7, D5142, Pullman uM60091. Erecting Shop: ED7, D55, D123, D189, D2507, D2859, D2908/10, 13304, 42080/96, 44137, 47000, 47319 (being cut-up), 48009, 48214/79/85/6, 73031, 75009/18/54. Paint Shop: M.R. 1000, 42212. Stone Pit: 48718, 58137/63/6. Foundry Row: 42388, 42500, 47554, 73016, 73157. Klondyke Sidings: D84, 44020, 44122/43, 44435, 47588 (last five locos. frames only). Bone Yard: 10201/3. Ex Works on Shed: 42081 (12C), 42100 (5A), 44139 (16A), 44414 (15C), 44420 (17A), 48007 (21A), 48109 (21A), 75037 (1E). Research Dept.: E3030/71/87. SLS/196211

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
14/12/1945 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2212
Built at Derby Works
   
22/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B)    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ardrossan (30C)    
18/12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42212    
09/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A)    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Ardrossan (67D)    
06/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
26/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)    
21/08/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 42212    

prev prev