Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 857 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 4405 Week
» 5295 Month
» 313276 Year
» 1197657 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 2230   05/06/1946
BR 42230 w/e 14/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Fairburn
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 05/06/1946 to Southport (23C)
Withdrawal Sat 07/08/1965
Scrapping During 04/1966 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 19 yrs, 2 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
23C Southport (New) 05/06/1946
14B Kentish Town 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
33A Plaistow 4w/e 15/11/1952
34E Neasden 5w/e 23/04/1955
21A Saltley w/e 09/12/1961
17C Rowsley w/e 22/09/1962
16C Derby w/e 02/05/1964
16D Nottingham w/e 25/07/1964
16C Derby w/e 12/09/1964
9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 27/03/1965
   Withdrawn 07/08/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 14B Kentish Town w/e 04/10/1947
ALLOC 14B Kentish Town w/e 25/10/1947
ALLOC 13A Plaistow w/e 02/10/1948
ALLOC 33A Plaistow 4w/e 29/11/1952
ALLOC 34E Neasden 4w/e 23/04/1955
LOAN 14D Neasden 01/02/1958
ALLOC 14D Neasden 23/02/1958
ALLOC 21A Saltley 4w/e 30/12/1961
ALLOC 17C Rowsley 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 16C Derby 4w/e 02/05/1964
ALLOC 16D Nottingham 4w/e 08/08/1964
ALLOC 16C Derby w/e 12/09/1964
ALLOC 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 2w/e 10/04/1965
WDN   w/e 07/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/06/1946 To Service To service as LMS Number 2230
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Southport (23C)
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kentish Town (14B)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42230    
15/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
23/04/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (34E)    
09/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
22/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Rowsley (17C)    
02/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (16C)    
25/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16D)    
12/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (16C)    
27/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)    
07/08/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 42230    
04/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev