Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 280 Today
» 1253 Yesterday
» 7740 Week
» 5253 Month
» 233137 Year
» 1454702 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4267 m/e 11/1919

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 42xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-8-0T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 213
Works Number 2847
To Service During 11/1919
Withdrawal Tue 23/10/1962
Scrapping During 06/1963 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 42 yrs, 11 mths , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1919
86C Cardiff Canton m/e 31/07/1951
88C Barry 3w/e 17/05/1952
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 28/01/1956
86D Llantrisant 4w/e 26/12/1959
   Withdrawn 23/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ABEEG Aberbeeg 4w/e 17/05/1947
ALLOC CDF Cardiff Canton 4w/e 28/01/1950
ALLOC 86H Aberbeeg 4w/e 17/06/1950
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 14/07/1951
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 19/04/1952
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 28/01/1956
1STALLOC 86D Llantrisant 4w/e 26/12/1959
WDN   23/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1949 Swindon Works New Work April: Nos. *7903 Foremarke Hall (8/4), *7904 Fountains Hall (14/4), 7905 Fowey Hall LA (28/4); 9678 NA (1/4), 9679 CED (11/4), 9680 TYS (22/4), 9681 TDU (29/4). *Not allocated. Nos. 7903- 05 are painted black and fully lined, while Nos. 9678-81 are plain black. Nos. 7018 Cranbrook Castle and 7019 were nearly complete on 9/5 and the frames and cylinders for the first of the 15XX were in position for drilling. No. 4971 TN has been re-converted to coal-burning.
Locomotives entering Works during April included: Nos. 1003/15, 1418/48, 2014 (open cab), 2154 (open cab), 2213/34/65/73, 2812/50/55/61, 2908/12/42/50, 3011, 3666/86, 3737, 3846. 4051/75/88/94, 4138, 4267, 4500, 4663/89, 4805 (for re-conversion), 4908/15/22/41/49/86, 5016/44/54/56/69/74/84/89, 5311/53/60/82, 5523/39/55/74, 5800, 5970/73, 6018/28, 6351/63/67/93, 6812/16/41/48/60, 7236, 7749/53, 8703/43. Condemned: Nos. 47, 1758, 3592 (all to Concentration Yard), No. 277 (acting as Works' pilot). No. 3175 has been cut up in 'A' Shop. Nos. 6100/01/03/59 have had the footsteps set further inwards, to enable them to work on the Reading-Redhill line. No. 155 ex Works, has been fitted with a copper-capped parallel chimney replacing the tapered cast-iron one formerly carried. No. 3033, ex Works, now carries the frames, cylinders and cab sides of No. 3005 (condemned) and the boiler of No. 3033. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include: Nos. 1003, 5931, 6907/33; Nos. 4003/07/49 are painted dark green and fully lined. The contents of the Stock Shed on 3/5 were:-Nos. 2948, 4124/68/69, 4914, 5153, 5411, 5919, 6915/19/97/8/9 an 7902.
SLS/194906

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1919 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 4267
Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2847
   
31/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
28/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
26/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Llantrisant (86D)    
23/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 4267    

prev prev