Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 4290 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17696 Week
» 70712 Month
» 190239 Year
» 3217092 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4273 |
m/e |
03/1920 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
42xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-8-0T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
213 |
Works Number |
2853 |
To Service |
During 03/1920 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 09/10/1964 |
Service Life |
44 yrs, 7 mths , 10 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1920 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4273 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2853 |
|
|
01/12/1945 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tondu (TDU) |
|
|
13/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (87B) |
|
|
05/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llantrisant (86D) |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Blazey (83E) |
|
|
27/01/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
19/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tondu (88H) |
|
|
04/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barry (88C) |
|
|
09/10/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4273 |
|
|
02/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|