Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 3898 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17304 Week
» 70320 Month
» 189847 Year
» 3216700 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4276 |
m/e |
04/1920 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
42xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-8-0T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
213 |
Works Number |
2856 |
To Service |
During 04/1920 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 13/11/1962 |
Service Life |
42 yrs, 7 mths , 13 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1964 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
86F |
Tondu |
4w/e |
25/02/1950 |
ALLOC |
86H |
Aberbeeg |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
ALLOC |
86B |
Newport Pill |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
13/11/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1920 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4276 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2856 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ebbw Junction (Newport) (NPT ) |
|
|
25/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tondu (86F) |
|
|
20/04/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberbeeg (86H) |
|
|
25/01/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newport Pill (86B) |
|
|
13/11/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4276 |
|
|
09/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|