Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 234 Today
» 1253 Yesterday
» 7694 Week
» 5207 Month
» 233091 Year
» 1454656 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
S&DJR 90 m/e 08/1925
LMS (1st) 9680 y/e 1930
LMS (2nd) 13810 y/e 1932
BR 53810 w/e 30/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 7F
Company History SDJR/LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 08/1925
Withdrawal 4w/e Tue 31/12/1963
Scrapping During 02/1964 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 38 yrs , 5 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1925
22C Bath Green Park (S&D) 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn 4w/e 31/12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   4w/e 31/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/06/1951 Derby Works New construction of class 5MT up to 73008, latter being frame only. 73005 in paint shop, others in course of construction. Diesels complete up to 12091, 12092 having motors on so far. Little change of stored engines. On works were 40546 an 41049, both damaged, 44102 (71H), 53810 (71G); 58285 (3B) for special examination. SLS/195108
14/07/1951 Derby Works During the first half of July new 5MT 73000/5/6/7 went back into works for modification to drawgear; others were laid down up to 73012, also frames of diesel 12094. Into shops: 2159 (86G), 40011, 40472, 40508, 40629, 681, 40925, 41044, 41079, 41803/13, 41901, 42141, 42218 (33A), 42323, 42390 (87K), 43235/90, 43631, 43792 (71H), 43987, 44039, 44162, 44467, 44589, 45183 (84G), 47353, 47440/6, 47585, M7603, 47607, 58077, 22951, 64712/55 (39A), 64768 (30A). 40508, 41044 and 58077 were in for special examination. Where sheds are quoted, the locos. are other than L.M.R. stock. In works yard (withdrawn): 1781, 1856, 3617 (58296), 58237, 58302. Stored near station: 40411/6/26, 43312/68, 43469/96, 43574, 58163. Off works: 12015, 40012, 40396, 40402/44/86, 40583, 40935, 41078/87, 42141, 42218, 42317/84, 42411, 42525, 43218, 43331, 43787, 43907/76, 44102/23/34, 44268, 47266, 47357, 47547/89/95, 47611, 53810, 58040, 58300, 64796, 64887. Of these 40583, 42525:43907, 47357 and 53810 are still lettered L.M.S, and 40396 now has tall Stanier chimney in place of previous L.M.S. lipped pattern. SLS/195109
09/01/1961 Derby MPD Ex-Works on Shed: 42209/366/503/09/19, 43854, 53810, 73136/8, 48073. SLS/196102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1925 To Service To service as S&DJR Number 90
Built at Derby Works
   
1930 Renumbered Renumbered to 9680    
1932 Renumbered Renumbered to 13810    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bath Green Park (S&D) (22C)    
30/04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 53810    
31/12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 53810    

prev